This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 13:38:47 (UTC).

Lutron Electronics Co., Inc. v. Legrand North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 Lutron Electronics Co , Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Legrand North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-01412

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lutron Electronics Co., Inc.

Defendants

Current Products Corp.

Pass & Seymour, Inc.

Watt Stoper, Inc.

Legrand North America, LLC

Legrand North America, LLC doing business as Legrand, Pass & Seymour, Inc.

QMotion Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Raabe

Attorney at Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP

29 South Main Street, Suite 305

West Hartford, CT 06107

 

Court Documents

9 #2

Exhibit

9 #1

Complaint

#9

(#9) AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #7 Standing Order in Patent Cases, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Exhibit,, filed by Lutron Electronics Co., Inc., and #1 Complaint, filed by Lutron Electronics Co., Inc. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 11/21/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2017. Discovery due by 2/20/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2018. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

2 #5

Exhibit F - U.S. Patent No. 9,361,790 (the "790 patent")

2 #4

Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 9,024,800 (the "800 patent")

2 #2

Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,803,728 (the "728 patent")

2 #1

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,704,459 (the "459 patent")

#2

(#2) EXHIBIT A - U.S. Patent No. 8,242,714 (the "714 patent") by Lutron Electronics Co., Inc. re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,704,459 (the "459 patent"), #2 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,803,728 (the "728 patent"), #3 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 7,663,325 (the "325 patent"), #4 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 9,024,800 (the "800 patent"), #5 Exhibit F - U.S. Patent No. 9,361,790 (the "790 patent"))(Raabe, Craig) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CURRENT PRODUCTS CORP., f/k/a QMOTION INC., LEGRAND NORTH AMERICA, LLC d/b/a LEGRAND, Pass & Seymour, Inc., THE WATT STOPPER, INC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4506797.), filed by LUTRON ELECTRONICS CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raabe, Craig) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #7 Standing Order in Patent Cases, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Exhibit,, filed by Lutron Electronics Co., Inc., and #1 Complaint, filed by Lutron Electronics Co., Inc. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 11/21/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2017. Discovery due by 2/20/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2018. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT A - U.S. Patent No. 8,242,714 (the "714 patent") by Lutron Electronics Co., Inc. re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,704,459 (the "459 patent"), #2 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,803,728 (the "728 patent"), #3 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 7,663,325 (the "325 patent"), #4 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 9,024,800 (the "800 patent"), #5 Exhibit F - U.S. Patent No. 9,361,790 (the "790 patent"))(Raabe, Craig) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketJudge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CURRENT PRODUCTS CORP., f/k/a QMOTION INC., LEGRAND NORTH AMERICA, LLC d/b/a LEGRAND, Pass & Seymour, Inc., THE WATT STOPPER, INC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4506797.), filed by LUTRON ELECTRONICS CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raabe, Craig) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less