This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 13:13:39 (UTC).

Lurie v. Allied World Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Lurie filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael H. Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01417

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jonathan Lurie, Ph.D.

Jonathan Lurie

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Allied World Specialty Insurance Company f/k/a Darwin National Assurance Company

Allied World Specialty Insurance Company

Darwin National Assurance Company

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Jonathan Lurie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael E. Farnell

Attorney at Parsons Farnell & Grein, LLP

1030 Sw Morrison

Portland, OR 97205

Paul A. Mockford

Attorney at Parsons Farnell & Grein LLP

1030 Sw Morrison Street

Portland, OR 97205

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Roman D. Hernandez

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

100 Sw Main Street, Suite 1000

Portland, OR 97204

Jenni K. Katzer

Attorney at Troutman Sanders, LLP

5 Park Plaze, Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92614

Jennifer Mathis

Attorney at Troutman Sanders, LLP

580 California Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#15

(#15) Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#14

(#14) Answer to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with Jury Demand . Filed by Jonathan Lurie. (Mockford, Paul) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jenni K. Katzer for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5516460 issued. Signed on 8/21/2108 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Mathis for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5516448 issued. Signed on 8/21/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#7

(#7) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney JENNI KHUU KATZER . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5516460. Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/14/2018) (cw). (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#6

(#6) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney JENNIFER MATHIS . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5516448. Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/15/2018) (cw). (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#5

(#5) Answer to Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 AND, Counterclaim FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AGAINST Jonathan Lurie. Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/28/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/28/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 12/28/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jtj) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company f/k/a Darwin National Assurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Declaration of Roman D. Hernandez in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 USC sections 1332 and 1441(b). Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company f/k/a Darwin National Assurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV26777 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5498412 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company f/k/a Darwin National Assurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Order - The Court adopts the deadlines outline in the parties' joint status report (ECF #16 ) as follows: (1) Discovery is to be completed by 3/29/2019; (2) expert disclosures are due by 4/26/2019; (3) expert discovery to be completed by 5/31/2019; and (4) dispositive motions are due by 6/28/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Answer to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with Jury Demand . Filed by Jonathan Lurie. (Mockford, Paul) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • (#13) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jenni K. Katzer (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jkkatzer. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jenni K. Katzer for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5516460 issued. Signed on 8/21/2108 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • (#11) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jennifer Mathis (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jmathis. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Mathis for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5516448 issued. Signed on 8/21/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. The document has been replaced with an updated form. (cw) Modified on 8/15/2018 to correct document number. NEF Regenerated to the parties. (cw) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. Updated form submitted to replace original. (cw) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney JENNI KHUU KATZER . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5516460. Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/14/2018) (cw). (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney JENNIFER MATHIS . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5516448. Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/15/2018) (cw). (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Answer to Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 AND, Counterclaim FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AGAINST Jonathan Lurie. Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/28/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/28/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 12/28/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jtj) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company f/k/a Darwin National Assurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Declaration of Roman D. Hernandez in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 USC sections 1332 and 1441(b). Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company f/k/a Darwin National Assurance Company. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV26777 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5498412 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company f/k/a Darwin National Assurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied World Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul A. Mockford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael E. Farnell