This case was last updated from PACER on 06/20/2021 at 08:17:05 (UTC).

Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC v. Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-05029

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC

Defendant

Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony M Keats

Attorney at Keats Gatien LLP

120 South El Camino Drive Suite 207

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Konrad Karl Gatien

Attorney at Keats Gatien LLP

120 South El Camino Drive Suite 207

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Matthew Errett Graham

Attorney at Keats Gatien LLP

120 South El Camino Drive Suite 207

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

Mark B Mizrahi

Attorney at Freeman Freeman and Smiley LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Order Closing Case

#17

(#17) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order Closing Case) (ab) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

#16

(#16) ORDER ON STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(a)(A)(ii) #15 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the Stipulated Dismissal filed by the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Court hereby dismisses with prejudice the above-captioned action, Plaintiff and Defendant each to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (ab) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

15 #1

Proposed Order Stipulated Dismissal-ORDER

#15

(#15) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Dismissal-ORDER)(Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 11/22/2017)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2018 at 02:00 PM. (wm) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

#13

(#13) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc, (Mizrahi, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc.(Mizrahi, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

#11

(#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc answer now due 9/1/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc.(Attorney Mark B Mizrahi added to party Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc(pty:dft))(Mizrahi, Mark) (Entered: 07/27/2017)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC, upon Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc served on 7/12/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Person in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitysubstituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 07/17/2017)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

1 #3

Exhibit Complaint-Lunatick-EXHIBIT 4

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint-Lunatick-EXHIBIT 3

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint-Lunatick-EXHIBITS 1-2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20150294 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint-Lunatick-EXHIBITS 1-2, #2 Exhibit Complaint-Lunatick-EXHIBIT 3, #3 Exhibit Complaint-Lunatick-EXHIBIT 4) (Attorney Anthony M Keats added to party Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC(pty:pla))(Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order Closing Case) (ab) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER ON STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(a)(A)(ii) #15 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the Stipulated Dismissal filed by the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Court hereby dismisses with prejudice the above-captioned action, Plaintiff and Defendant each to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (ab) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Dismissal-ORDER)(Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 11/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2018 at 02:00 PM. (wm) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc, (Mizrahi, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc.(Mizrahi, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc answer now due 9/1/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc.(Attorney Mark B Mizrahi added to party Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc(pty:dft))(Mizrahi, Mark) (Entered: 07/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC, upon Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc served on 7/12/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Person in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitysubstituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 07/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 07/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jeffree Star Cosmetics Inc. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC. (Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC, identifying Lunatick Cosmetic Labs, LLC. (Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC. (Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC. (Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20150294 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint-Lunatick-EXHIBITS 1-2, #2 Exhibit Complaint-Lunatick-EXHIBIT 3, #3 Exhibit Complaint-Lunatick-EXHIBIT 4) (Attorney Anthony M Keats added to party Lunatick Cosmetic Labs LLC(pty:pla))(Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark B Mizrahi