This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2019 at 07:56:43 (UTC).

Luna, et al v. Feliciano, Jr., et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Luna filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Feliciano, Jr . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00340

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ryan A. Luna

Paul E. Martin

Defendants

Golden Rule Insurance Company

Jose A. Feliciano, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin C. Yelverton

Attorney at Scanes & Routh, LLP

P. O. Box 20965

Waco, TX 76710

Michael L. Scanes

Attorney at Scanes & Routh, LLP

7901 Fish Pond Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 20965

Waco, TX 76702-0965

Defendant Attorneys

Lance V. Clack

Attorney at Figari, Davenport, L.L.P.

3400 Bank Of America Plaza, 901 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75202

Andrew G. Jubinsky

Attorney at Figari & Davenport, L.L.P.

901 Main Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75202-3796

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ryan A. Luna, Paul E. Martin, re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Paul E. Martin, Plaintiff Ryan A. Luna (Yelverton, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Golden Rule Insurance Company, re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Paul E. Martin, Plaintiff Ryan A. Luna (Clack, Lance) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Clack, Lance) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

4 #4

Proposed Order

4 #3

Affidavit of Service for Jose Feliciano

4 #2

D's Notice of Removal

4 #1

Ps' 1st Amend. Petition

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ryan A. Luna, Paul E. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Ps' 1st Amend. Petition, #2 D's Notice of Removal, #3 Affidavit of Service for Jose Feliciano, #4 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Yelverton, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Clack, Lance) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

2 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #7

Exhibit D - List of Parties and Counse

2 #6

Exhibit C - C-10 thru C-13

2 #5

Exhibit C - C-6 thru C-9

2 #4

Exhibit C - C-1 thru C-5

2 #3

Exhibit C - Index of State Court Docs

2 #2

Exhibit B - Application

2 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ryan A. Luna, Paul E. Martin, re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Paul E. Martin, Plaintiff Ryan A. Luna (Yelverton, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Golden Rule Insurance Company, re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Paul E. Martin, Plaintiff Ryan A. Luna (Clack, Lance) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #5 Defendant's Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Motion to Remand entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Noting the agreement of the Parties, the Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion. Defendant Golden Rule Insurance Company's deadline to file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is extend to January 7, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Clack, Lance) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ryan A. Luna, Paul E. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Ps' 1st Amend. Petition, #2 D's Notice of Removal, #3 Affidavit of Service for Jose Feliciano, #4 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Yelverton, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Clack, Lance) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Golden Rule Insurance Company (Filing fee Received $400, Receipt # 0542-11459716), filed by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Application, #3 Exhibit C - Index of State Court Docs, #4 Exhibit C - C-1 thru C-5, #5 Exhibit C - C-6 thru C-9, #6 Exhibit C - C-10 thru C-13, #7 Exhibit D - List of Parties and Counse, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clack, Lance) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Certificate of Interested Parties by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Clack, Lance) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden Rule Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance V Clack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew G. Jubinsky