Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 14:15:46 (UTC).

Lucero v. Landis et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Lucero filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Landis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory B. Wormuth and Robert C. Brack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00788

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory B. Wormuth

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Brack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chloe A. Lucero

Beaverton, OR 97006

Defendants

Laura Hoyt

Max Landis

FilmNation Entertainment LLC

Film Finances Inc.

Bleecker Street Media LLC

UTMK Limited

Alan Amiel

GEM Entertainment

FNU LNU

Misfit Hostel

The Swen Group Inc.

Union Bank

MVPF I LLC

Ultra Louisiana LLC

Dreamgold Group S.A.

American Ultra Inc.

Elevation Pictures

Kinpil Entertainment Inc.

Lorne Michaels

15 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chloe A. Lucero. (yc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION REQUESTING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Chloe A. Lucero. (arn) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of CM/ECF Notification Form by Chloe A. Lucero (yc) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Refusal to Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Chloe A. Lucero (yc) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by Chloe A. Lucero. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Chloe A. Lucero. (jv) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chloe A. Lucero. (jv) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chloe A. Lucero. (yc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION REQUESTING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Chloe A. Lucero. (arn) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of CM/ECF Notification Form by Chloe A. Lucero (yc) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Refusal to Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Chloe A. Lucero (yc) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack assigned. (ln) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • (#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (jv)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jv) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by Chloe A. Lucero. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Chloe A. Lucero. (jv) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chloe A. Lucero. (jv) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEM Entertainment is a litigant

Latest cases where Film Finances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MUFG UNION BANK N.A. FKA UNION BANK N.A. is a litigant