This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2018 at 07:51:08 (UTC).

Lucas v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Lucas filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Russ Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00873

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Russ Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LaSonya Lucas

Defendants

Mariana Palacios

United States of America

Montgomery, AL 36101-0197

Theresa Abernathy

Birmingham, AL 35233

Kirk P. Withrow

Birmingham, AL 35233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fernando Antonio Morgan

Attorney at Morgan Law Firm

Post Office Box 241866

Montgomery, AL 36124

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by (illegible) on (no date given) for Robert Wilkie, Sec of Veterans Affairs. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

1 #2

Filing Fee Receipt

#10

(#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Hazel Perkins for Dr. Kirk P. Withrow served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct answer deadline to 60 days. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#13

(#13) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Rachel Lockhart on 10/26/2018 for Dr. Mariana Y. Palacios. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050989.), filed by LaSonya Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/16/2018 to include jury demand notation on first page.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018, omitted erroneously at original time of filing: #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (dmn, ). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by LaSonya Lucas. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#8

(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Lawrence B (name illegible) for U. S. Attorney's Office served on 10/18/2018, United States of America answer due 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff LaSonya Lucas. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#11

(#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Emily Sase for Attorney General of the United States served 10/23/2018.(dmn, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Honorable Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veteran Affairs. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

2 #1

Correct pdf of Complaint

#9

(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Hazel Perkins for Dr. Theresa Abernathy served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct answer deadline to 60 days. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Correction re #1 Complaint. The original pdf did not contain the jury demand notation on the first page. The correct pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Correct pdf of Complaint)(dmn, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Rachel Lockhart on 10/26/2018 for Dr. Mariana Y. Palacios. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by (illegible) on (no date given) for Robert Wilkie, Sec of Veterans Affairs. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #10 Return Receipt Card, #9 Return Receipt Card. The referenced docket entries were modified to reflect the answer due date for 60 days, set for 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Reset Answer Deadlines for Federal Defendants Theresa Abernathy and Kirk P. Withrow to 12/17/2018; original dates were erroneously not set for 60 days. (dmn, )(NO PDF) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Emily Sase for Attorney General of the United States served 10/23/2018.(dmn, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Hazel Perkins for Dr. Kirk P. Withrow served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct answer deadline to 60 days. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Hazel Perkins for Dr. Theresa Abernathy served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct answer deadline to 60 days. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Lawrence B (name illegible) for U. S. Attorney's Office served on 10/18/2018, United States of America answer due 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Honorable Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veteran Affairs. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Correction re #1 Complaint. This notice is docketed to include the pdf of the additional attachment, Civil Filing Fee, which was erroneously omitted at the time of filing of the referenced document. The pdf of the attachment, Civil Filing Fee is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff LaSonya Lucas. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Correction re #1 Complaint. The original pdf did not contain the jury demand notation on the first page. The correct pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Correct pdf of Complaint)(dmn, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by LaSonya Lucas. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LaSonya Lucas. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050989.), filed by LaSonya Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/16/2018 to include jury demand notation on first page.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018, omitted erroneously at original time of filing: #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (dmn, ). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.