This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2019 at 07:45:45 (UTC).

Loxo Oncology, Inc. et al v. Array Biopharma, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Loxo Oncology, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Array Biopharma, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip A. Brimmer and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03062

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Tony Morales

Andrew Metcalf

Loxo Oncology, Inc.

Gabrielle Kolakowski

Shane Walls

Megan McKenney

Elizabeth McFaddin

Joshua Ballard

Barbara Brandhuber

Steven Andrews

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Array Biopharma, Inc.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John-Paul S. Deol

Patrick Eugene Premo

Matthew John Worthington

John F. Walsh, III

Jedediah Wakefield

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Sean Robert Gallagher

James D. Judah

 

Court Documents

#64

RESTRICTED

#63

62 #3

Exhibit A - Declaration of Patrick Premo

62 #2

Declaration of Patrick Premo

62 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#62

#61

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

54 #16

Exhibit 14

54 #15

Exhibit 13

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#4

#2

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Partial TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on January 15, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-52. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, ) (Entered: 01/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Briefing Schedule for Counterclaim-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Re: Dkt. No. 17) by Counter Claimant Array Biopharma, Inc., Defendant Array Biopharma, Inc.. (Judah, James) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MOTION to Dismiss Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) by Counter Defendants Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane Walls, Plaintiffs Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane Walls. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Declaration of Patrick Premo, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Patrick Premo)(Walsh, John) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) RESTRICTED TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on January 15, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-48. (smitc, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery; granting #54 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration in Support of #38 Brief in Opposition to Motion; granting #55 Motion for Leave to Restrict. Motion Hearing held on 1/15/2019. The record of this hearing from 12:23 p.m until the end is to be SEALED and if a transcript is requested, it will be filed as restricted for the Court and parties only to view. Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MEMORANDUM regarding #54 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration in Support of #38 Brief in Opposition to Motion, filed by Joshua Ballard, Tony Morales, Megan McKenney, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Steven Andrews, Andrew Metcalf, Elizabeth McFaddin, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Shane Walls, #55 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Joshua Ballard, Tony Morales, Megan McKenney, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Steven Andrews, Andrew Metcalf, Elizabeth McFaddin, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Shane Walls. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/14/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) BRIEF in Opposition to #54 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration in Support of #38 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, Counterclaim-Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File "Supplemental" Surreply Declaration in Opposition to Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Counter Claimant Array Biopharma, Inc., Defendant Array Biopharma, Inc.. (Judah, James) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit 23 to #54 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration in Support by Counter Defendants Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane Walls, Plaintiffs Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane Walls. (Walsh, John) Modified on 1/14/2019 to add linkage and add document title. (sphil, ). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Counter Defendants Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane Walls, Plaintiffs Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane Walls.. (Walsh, John) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Counter Defendants Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane Walls, Plaintiffs Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane Walls. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Walsh, John) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, ) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Array BioPharma Inc. re #8 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane Walls. (Premo, Patrick) (Entered: 12/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Array Biopharma, Inc. Attorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Barbara Brandhuber(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Steven Andrews(pty:pla), filed by Andrew Metcalf, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Tony Morales, Joshua Ballard, Shane Walls, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Barbara Brandhuber, Steven Andrews.(Premo, Patrick) (Entered: 12/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John-Paul S. Deol on behalf of Joshua Ballard, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane WallsAttorney John-Paul S. Deol added to party Joshua Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney John-Paul S. Deol added to party Gabrielle Kolakowski(pty:pla), Attorney John-Paul S. Deol added to party Loxo Oncology, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John-Paul S. Deol added to party Elizabeth McFaddin(pty:pla), Attorney John-Paul S. Deol added to party Megan McKenney(pty:pla), Attorney John-Paul S. Deol added to party Andrew Metcalf(pty:pla), Attorney John-Paul S. Deol added to party Tony Morales(pty:pla), Attorney John-Paul S. Deol added to party Shane Walls(pty:pla) (Deol, John-Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick Eugene Premo on behalf of Joshua Ballard, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane WallsAttorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Joshua Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Gabrielle Kolakowski(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Loxo Oncology, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Elizabeth McFaddin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Megan McKenney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Andrew Metcalf(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Tony Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Eugene Premo added to party Shane Walls(pty:pla) (Premo, Patrick) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jedediah Wakefield on behalf of Joshua Ballard, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Shane WallsAttorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Joshua Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Gabrielle Kolakowski(pty:pla), Attorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Loxo Oncology, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Elizabeth McFaddin(pty:pla), Attorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Megan McKenney(pty:pla), Attorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Andrew Metcalf(pty:pla), Attorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Tony Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Shane Walls(pty:pla) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Hanlon-Leh, Natalie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Array Biopharma, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6417222)Attorney Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh added to party Josh Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh added to party Gabrielle Kolakowski(pty:pla), Attorney Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh added to party Loxo Oncology, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh added to party Elizabeth McFaddin(pty:pla), Attorney Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh added to party Megan McKenney(pty:pla), Attorney Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh added to party Andrew Metcalf(pty:pla), Attorney Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh added to party Tony Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh added to party Shane Walls(pty:pla), filed by Andrew Metcalf, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Tony Morales, Josh Ballard, Shane Walls, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hanlon-Leh, Natalie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less