This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 14:17:55 (UTC).

Love's Travel Stop and County Stores et al v. M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 Love's Travel Stop and County Stores filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against M M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candace J. Smith and David L. Bunning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company

Love's Travel Stop and County Stores

Defendants

M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc.

M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc. doing business as M&M Mid-Valley Supply

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Mills Mayer

Attorney at Phillips Parker Orberson & Arnett PLC - Louisville

716 W. Main Street, Suite 300

Louisville, KY 40202

William N. Clark, Jr.

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - Philadelphia PA

1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Donald L. Miller, II

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lou

9300 Shelbyville Road, Suite 400

Louisville, KY 40222

Heather M. McCollum

Attorney at Quintaros, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lex

2452 Sir Barton Way, Suite 300

Lexington, KY 40509

 

Court Documents

11 #3

Proposed Order proposed order

11 #2

Exhibi 1 Certificate of Good Standing

11 #1

Affidavit of William N. Clark, Jr.

#11

(#11) MOTION for William N. Clark, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Love's Travel Stop and County Stores ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4186695)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William N. Clark, Jr., #2 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order proposed order)(Mayer, Christopher) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (TJZ). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

10 #1

MJ Consent Form

#10

(#10) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT; 1)Parties to meet w/in 21 days to discuss nature/basis of claims and defenses and possibility for a prompt settlement, to make or arrange for the disclosures required and to develop a proposed discovery plan; 2)10 days thereafter, parties to file a Joint Status Report containing: (a) proposed discovery plan; (b) parties estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions; (c) parties belief as to whether the matter is suitable for some form of alternative dispute resolution such as mediation; (d) parties' estimate as the probable length of trial; (e) whether the parties consent to the presiding magistrate judge for all purposes; 3)Should parties find that a joint report is not possible, parties to file individual reports which the Court will entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#9

(#9) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc. for M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc... (McCollum, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc..(McCollum, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#6

(#6) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual for Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company. (ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Love's Travel Stop and County Stores. (ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Mills Mayer on behalf of Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company, Love's Travel Stop and County Stores (ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #11 MOTION for William N. Clark, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Love's Travel Stop and County Stores ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4186695) (TJZ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Christopher Mayer re #11 MOTION for William N. Clark, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Love's Travel Stop and County Stores ; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit, Attachment. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR(TJZ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed re #11 MOTION for William N. Clark, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Love's Travel Stop and County Stores ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4186695). (TJZ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for William N. Clark, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Love's Travel Stop and County Stores ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4186695)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William N. Clark, Jr., #2 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order proposed order)(Mayer, Christopher) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (TJZ). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT; 1)Parties to meet w/in 21 days to discuss nature/basis of claims and defenses and possibility for a prompt settlement, to make or arrange for the disclosures required and to develop a proposed discovery plan; 2)10 days thereafter, parties to file a Joint Status Report containing: (a) proposed discovery plan; (b) parties estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions; (c) parties belief as to whether the matter is suitable for some form of alternative dispute resolution such as mediation; (d) parties' estimate as the probable length of trial; (e) whether the parties consent to the presiding magistrate judge for all purposes; 3)Should parties find that a joint report is not possible, parties to file individual reports which the Court will entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #8 Answer to Complaint (TJZ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc. for M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc... (McCollum, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc..(McCollum, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to M&M Service Station Equipment Specialist, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual for Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company. (ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Love's Travel Stop and County Stores. (ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Mills Mayer on behalf of Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company, Love's Travel Stop and County Stores (ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4147461), filed by Love's Travel Stop and County Stores, Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ECO) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less