This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:54:59 (UTC).

Love v. Unknown Party et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Love filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Unknown Party. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03130

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Lunar Love, Jr.

Phoenix, AZ 85007

Defendants

Genesse Health System

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Terros Incorporated

Unknown Party

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

(#3) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Jeffrey Lunar Love, Jr. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03130-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either pay the filing fee associated with this action or file a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis that addresses the discrepancies identified in this order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this case without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/15/2018. (MMO) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeffrey Lunar Love, Jr. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey Lunar Love, Jr.(BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER: Civil Case Terminated pursuant to (Doc. #7 ). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either pay the filing fee associated with this action or file a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis that addresses the discrepancies identified in this order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this case without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/15/2018. (MMO) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03130-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Jeffrey Lunar Love, Jr. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeffrey Lunar Love, Jr. (BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey Lunar Love, Jr.(BAS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.