This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:02:34 (UTC).

Love v. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Love filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Hixson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-04575

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Hixson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyrone Love

Defendants

Nancy A Berryhill

Nancy A. Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan Ray Dunnigan

Attorney at Homeless Action Center

2601 San Pablo Avenue

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

Carol S. Clark

Attorney at Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/12/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

10 #1

Consent/Declination Form

#14

(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/12/18. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO NOTIFY THE COURT IF THEY CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 29, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination Form) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER (Social Security Review Action). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#9

RESTRICTED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/12/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/12/18. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tyrone Love.. (Dunnigan, Alan) (Filed on 9/7/2018) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO NOTIFY THE COURT IF THEY CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 29, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination Form) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A. Berryhill.. (Clark, Carol) (Filed on 8/28/2018) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Acknowledgment of Receipt by United States Marshals Service of summons & complaint. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshal's Post Box in the Clerk's Office mailroom. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #(1) USM Form 285) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER (Social Security Review Action). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Tyrone Love - Correction of Docket #[1-1] Complaint. (Dunnigan, Alan) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Please re-file civil cover sheet only using the court's latest version available on our website. Thank you. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Tyrone Love (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tyrone Love. (Dunnigan, Alan) (Filed on 7/27/2018) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against Nancy A. Berryhill. Filed by Tyrone Love. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Dunnigan, Alan) (Filed on 7/27/2018) Modified on 8/1/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.