This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2018 at 05:55:28 (UTC).

Lough v. BNSF Railway Company

Case Summary

On 04/25/2016 Lough filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against BNSF Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephan M. Vidmar and Gregory J. Fouratt. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-00338

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

Presiding Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Lough

Defendant

BNSF Railway Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Matthew Fine(Designation Retained)

Anthony M. DiGiulio(Designation Retained)

Charlotte Itoh(Designation Retained)

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 51 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Deadlines, Vacate the Trial, and Stay the Case for 60 days. (am)

#39

(#39) STIPULATED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery terminates July 17, 2017. Pretrial Motions due by August 16, 2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by October 15, 2017. (sg)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 51 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Deadlines, Vacate the Trial, and Stay the Case for 60 days. (am)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) STIPULATED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery terminates July 17, 2017. Pretrial Motions due by August 16, 2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by October 15, 2017. (sg)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less