This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 08:02:39 (UTC).

Lott et al v. ExxonMobil Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Lott filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ExxonMobil Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01027

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elton C Lott

Peggy Lott Deville

Raymond Lott

Benjamin Lott

Defendants

Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.

ExxonMobil Corporation

Arrowood Indemnity Company

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

The Travelers Indemnity Company

Union Carbide Corporation

Owens-Illinois, Inc

Resco Holdings L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lewis O. Unglesby

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Lawrence G. Gettys

Attorney at Robins Cloud, LLP

9191 Siegen Lane, Building 7

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Jordan L Bollinger

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorneys

Arthur H. Leith

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford- N.O.

12Th Floor, 601 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Anthony J. Gambino, Jr.

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

400 Convention Street, Suite 1100

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator and Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

John Allain Viator

Attorney at Bienvenu Bonnecaze Foco Viator & Holinga

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Jacqueline Romero

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker, Carey, Loeb & Hymel

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3200

New Orleans, LA 70163-1132

Lawrence G. Pugh, III

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3200

New Orleans, LA 70163

Shelley L. Thompson

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas & Radecker, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

P. O. Box 3513

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-3513

Patrick D. Roquemore

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

P. O. Box 3513

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-3513

Simeon B. Reimonenq, Jr.

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard

601 Poydras Street, Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kristopher T. Wilson

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard

601 Poydras Street, Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kathleen Jordan

Attorney at Pugh Accardo Haas Radecker & Carey, LLC

1100 Poydras St., Ste 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Milele N. St. Julien

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Schell Weiner Richeson

1615 Poydras St., Ste. 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Perry, Watkins, Krutz & Tardy - JAC

P.O. Box 22608, 200 S. Lamar St., Suite 100

Jackson, MS 39225-2608

Mary Arthur

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Nicole M. Loup

Attorney at Sulzer & Williams, LLC

201 Holiday Blvd., Suite 335

Covington, LA 70433

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Bollinger, Jordan) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Peggy Lott Deville, Benjamin Lott, Elton C Lott, Raymond Lott (Bollinger, Jordan) Modified on 11/21/2018 to edit the text (KAH) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #7

Exhibit F

4 #2

Attachment Proposed Order

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #9

Exhibit H

12 #2

Memorandum in Support

#14

(#14) RULING AND ORDER: Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Remand is GRANTED, remanding this matter to the 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/3/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

3 #1

Affidavit

#13

(#13) NOTICE AND ORDER: Any defendant who intends to file an opposition to the Motion to Remand shall file, within 5 days of this Notice and Order, a Notice of Intent to Oppose Motion to Remand. This filing will not impact the number of days permitted to file a response to a motion under Local Civil Rule 7(f). The parties to this suit are FURTHER NOTIFIED that if the Motion to Remand is opposed, additional briefing by separate order will be required to address the jurisdictional issues raised by the assertions in the Notice of Removal that certain non-diverse defendants are improperly joined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder- Doomes on 12/3/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#15

(#15) Judgment is hereby entered, remanding this matter to 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge. Certified copy of this order sent to 19th JDC. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/3/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Judgment is hereby entered, remanding this matter to 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge. Certified copy of this order sent to 19th JDC. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/3/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RULING AND ORDER: Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Remand is GRANTED, remanding this matter to the 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/3/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines (Court Use Only) (SGO) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE AND ORDER: Any defendant who intends to file an opposition to the Motion to Remand shall file, within 5 days of this Notice and Order, a Notice of Intent to Oppose Motion to Remand. This filing will not impact the number of days permitted to file a response to a motion under Local Civil Rule 7(f). The parties to this suit are FURTHER NOTIFIED that if the Motion to Remand is opposed, additional briefing by separate order will be required to address the jurisdictional issues raised by the assertions in the Notice of Removal that certain non-diverse defendants are improperly joined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder- Doomes on 12/3/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Bollinger, Jordan) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER approving #10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Elton C Lott, Peggy Lott Deville, Benjamin Lott, Raymond Lott. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/26/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Peggy Lott Deville, Benjamin Lott, Elton C Lott, Raymond Lott (Bollinger, Jordan) Modified on 11/21/2018 to edit the text (KAH) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #2 , #3 and #4 Motions forSteven J. Barber, William T. Hassler and Stephen A. Fennell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting is granted in part #6 MOTION to Substitute Doc 2-2. The clerk's office is directed to replace R. Doc. 2-1 with 6-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(JHF) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Substitute Doc 2-2 - Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen A. Fennell by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Steven J. Barber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1864454). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Attachment Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Steven J. Barber to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1864454) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for William T. Hassler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1864410). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for William T. Hassler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1864410) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Stephen A. Fennell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1864306). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Stephen A. Fennell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1864306) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay) Modified on 11/26/2018 to replace attachment as per rec doc 8 (KAH). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 653,792. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1864251), filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P-1, #18 Exhibit P-2, #19 Exhibit P-3, #20 Exhibit P-4, #21 Exhibit P-5)(Jalenak, Jay) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.