This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2019 at 18:57:22 (UTC).

LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated v. Union Street Detroit, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated filed an Other lawsuit against Union Street Detroit, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Goldsmith and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-12637

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated

Defendants

Union Street Detroit, LLC

Ginger Zauner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark A. Amendola

Attorney at Martyn Assoc.

820 Superior Avenue, Nw

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Ginger Zauner. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Plaintiff in Support

#14

(#14) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ginger Zauner by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Plaintiff in Support) (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#13

(#13) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Corporate Defendant Union Street Detroit, LLC Only by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#12

(#12) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Ginger Zauner* (DWor) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#11

(#11) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Union Street Detroit, LLC* (DWor) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ginger Zauner by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Union Street Detroit, LLC by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ginger Zauner served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Union Street Detroit, LLC served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Amendola on behalf of LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Ginger Zauner* (NAhm) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Union Street Detroit, LLC* (NAhm) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated against Union Street Detroit, LLC, Ginger Zauner. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6874340 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Ginger Zauner. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ginger Zauner by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Plaintiff in Support) (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Corporate Defendant Union Street Detroit, LLC Only by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Ginger Zauner* (DWor) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Union Street Detroit, LLC* (DWor) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ginger Zauner by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Union Street Detroit, LLC by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ginger Zauner served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Union Street Detroit, LLC served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING CERTIFICATION REQUIREMENTS. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Amendola on behalf of LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Ginger Zauner* (NAhm) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Union Street Detroit, LLC* (NAhm) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by LoPiccolo Brothers Produce, Incorporated against Union Street Detroit, LLC, Ginger Zauner. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6874340 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.