This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2018 at 07:52:44 (UTC).

Lopez-Mieres v. Cruz-Soto et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 Lopez-Mieres filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cruz-Soto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gustavo A. Gelpi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01588

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gustavo A. Gelpi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adolfo Daniel Lopez-Mieres

Defendants

Carmen Yulin Cruz-Soto

Hato Rey, PR 00918

Municipality of San Juan

Insurance Companies X and Y

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francisco M. Lopez-Romo

431 Ponce De Leon Ave., National Plaza Suite 1500

San Juan, PR 00917

Defendant Attorneys

Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez

Attorney at Quinones & Arbona, PSC

Po Box 10906

San Juan, PR 00922

Raul S. Mariani-Franco

Attorney at Mariani Franco Law Office

Po Box 9022864

San Juan, PR 00902-2864

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #5

6

4 #4

5

4 #3

4

4 #2

3

4 #1

2

#4

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Granting until November 14, 2018, #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/12/2018. (LE) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Granting as requested #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/12/2018. (LE) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Amended Complain or Otherwise Plead filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 10/25/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Municipality of San Juan (Mariani-Franco, Raul) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until November 9, 2018 and NOTICE of Appearance by Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez on behalf of Carmen Yulin Cruz-Soto (Martinez-Velazquez, Giselle) Modified on 10/11/2018 to correct event type and title (gmm). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carmen Yulin Cruz-Soto, Municipality of San Juan, filed by Adolfo Daniel Lopez-Mieres.(Lopez-Romo, Francisco) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(gmm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Carmen Yulin Cruz-Soto, Municipality of San Juan (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Carmen Yulin Cruz-Soto, Municipality of San Juan ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6018985.), filed by Adolfo Daniel Lopez-Mieres. Service due by 11/20/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lopez-Romo, Francisco) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Companies X, Y & Z is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francisco M. Lopez-Romo