This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2021 at 00:33:02 (UTC).

Lopez et al v. ZocDoc Incorporated

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 Lopez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ZocDoc Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is David G Campbell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-03419

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David G Campbell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lopez

Leonardo Lopez

Samuel Blackshear

Howard Goldstein

Justin White

Defendant

ZocDoc Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Preston K Flood

Sean Christopher Davis

Trey A R Dayes, III

Defendant Attorneys

Tracy Ann Miller

Douglas Calvin Lynn, III

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) ORDER granting #37 Stipulation of Dismissal: This matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/27/17. (DXD) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

37 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#37

(#37) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Samuel Blackshear, Howard Goldstein, Leonardo Lopez, Justin White. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Sean) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#36

(#36) ORDER: Matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on November 27, 2017 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/27/2017. (TCA) (Entered: 10/27/2017)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Settlement by ZocDoc Incorporated. (Miller, Tracy) (Entered: 10/27/2017)

32 #1

Exhibit A

#32

(#32) NOTICE re: Filing Letter Anticipating Motion for Summary Judgment by ZocDoc Incorporated re: #14 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lynn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/29/2017)

31 #1

Exhibit to Notice

#31

(#31) *NOTICE re: of Filing Correspondence by Leonardo Lopez, Justin White, Howard Goldstein, Samuel Blackshear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice)(Davis, Sean) *Modified to add filers on 10/2/2017 (DXD). (Entered: 09/29/2017)

7 #1

Exhibit Redline - First Amended Complaint

#7

(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by ZocDoc Incorporated.(Lynn, Douglas) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

#6

(#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Samuel Blackshear, Howard Goldstein, Leonardo Lopez: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/20/2016 to ZocDoc, Inc. . (Davis, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2016)

#5

(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/7/2016. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 10/07/2016)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ZocDoc Incorporated. (DXD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/07/2016)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13476842. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-03419-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD) (Entered: 10/07/2016)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Samuel Blackshear, Howard Goldstein, Leonardo Lopez (submitted by Sean Davis). (DXD) (Entered: 10/07/2016)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13476842 filed by Leonardo Lopez, Howard Goldstein, Samuel Blackshear (submitted by Sean Davis). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DXD) (Entered: 10/07/2016)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #37 Stipulation of Dismissal: This matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/27/17. (DXD) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Samuel Blackshear, Howard Goldstein, Leonardo Lopez, Justin White. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Sean) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER: Matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on November 27, 2017 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/27/2017. (TCA) (Entered: 10/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Settlement by ZocDoc Incorporated. (Miller, Tracy) (Entered: 10/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Conference held on 10/12/2017. Filing of motions for summary judgment discussed. Defendant's motion for summary judgment due 10/27/2017. Plaintiffs' response/cross motion for summary judgment due 11/17/2017. Defendant response/reply due 12/8/2017. Plaintiff reply due 12/20/2017. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Sean Davis for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Tracy Miller for Defendant (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 2:31 PM to 2:42 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 10/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER re: #32 Notice (Other) filed by ZocDoc Incorporated, #31 Notice (Other) filed by Samuel Blackshear, Leonardo Lopez, Howard Goldstein, Justin White. Telephone Conference set for 10/12/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel shall coordinate a conference call with counsel for both parties and the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/3/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE re: Filing Letter Anticipating Motion for Summary Judgment by ZocDoc Incorporated re: #14 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lynn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) *NOTICE re: of Filing Correspondence by Leonardo Lopez, Justin White, Howard Goldstein, Samuel Blackshear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice)(Davis, Sean) *Modified to add filers on 10/2/2017 (DXD). (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Deposition of Ryan Stam, filed by Leonardo Lopez. (Davis, Sean) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Deposition of Leonardo Lopez, filed by ZocDoc Incorporated. (Miller, Tracy) (Entered: 08/25/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by ZocDoc Incorporated.(Lynn, Douglas) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER pursuant to #8 Stipulation : ZocDoc Incorporated answer due 1/3/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/21/2016. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 12/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Joint Motion Regarding Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by ZocDoc Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynn, Douglas) *Modified to correct event; attorney notified on 12/22/2016 (DXD). (Entered: 12/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Leonardo Lopez, Howard Goldstein, Samuel Blackshear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline - First Amended Complaint)(Davis, Sean) *Modified to add Plaintiff Justin White on 12/6/2016 (LSP). (Entered: 12/06/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Samuel Blackshear, Howard Goldstein, Leonardo Lopez: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/20/2016 to ZocDoc, Inc. . (Davis, Sean) (Entered: 10/26/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/7/2016. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 10/07/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ZocDoc Incorporated. (DXD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/07/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13476842. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-03419-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD) (Entered: 10/07/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Samuel Blackshear, Howard Goldstein, Leonardo Lopez (submitted by Sean Davis). (DXD) (Entered: 10/07/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13476842 filed by Leonardo Lopez, Howard Goldstein, Samuel Blackshear (submitted by Sean Davis). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DXD) (Entered: 10/07/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less