This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2018 at 07:31:22 (UTC).

Longe v. Milwaukee County et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 Longe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Milwaukee County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01128

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeremy R. Longe

Jeremy R Longe

Defendants

Vicki Brown

Vivalynn Anderson

Batina Traweck

Barbara Williams`

Barbra Wigley

Diana Mueller

Shaune Trevino

Ashley Doe

Jill Wallers

Richard E. Schmidt

John Doe #1-10

Rene Richardson

Milwaukee County

Kristen Babe

David J Clarke, Jr

Richard E Schmidt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walter W Stern, III

Attorney at Walter W Stern Attorney at Law

920 85Th St - Ste 123

Kenosha, WI 53143

 

Court Documents

6 #4

Summons

6 #1

Summons

6 #5

Summons

6 #3

Summons

6 #9

Summons

6 #10

Summons

6 #7

Summons

6 #8

Summons

6 #13

Summons

6 #14

Summons

6 #11

Summons

6 #12

Summons

6 #6

Summons

6 #2

Summons

#6

(#6) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Stern, Walter)

5 #3

Summons

5 #4

Summons

5 #5

Summons

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Stern, Walter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Stern, Walter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from Attorney Walter W. Stern III . (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Stern, Walter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from Attorney Walter W. Stern III . (Stern, Walter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons is blank - in the future please remember to submit completed summons. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Stern, Walter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Jeremy R. Longe. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2881188) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stern, Walter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.