This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2018 at 07:54:27 (UTC).

Lockhart v. Chatten et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Lockhart filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Chatten. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danny R. Lockhart

South Charleston, WV 25309

Defendants

David R. Singleton

Andrew Chatten

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Mail sent to Danny R. Lockhart #10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. Returned: Return to Sender - Unclaimed - Unable to Forward. (cwm) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

12 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#12

(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/28/2018. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#11

(#11) Mail sent to Danny R. Lockhart #9 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT - Returned: Return to Sender - Unclaimed - Unable to Forward. (cwm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

10 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

10 #1

Court-Approved Form 1983 Forms

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Form 1983 Forms) Notice and forms mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR per RWT Chambers (BS).(cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/11/2018)

9 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00995. (cwm) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE directing that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division, P.O. Box 2857, Clarksburg, West Virginia 26302, for additional proceedings; the plaintiff is directed to address any further information concerning this matter to that court, which will assign the case a new case number and take any further action as the court deems necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 10/10/2018. (cc: plaintiff) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#6

(#6) LETTER to Danny R. Lockhart, from Rory L. Perry II dated 6/26/2018, re: #5 letter-form notice of change of address and request for pro se handbook. (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

#5

(#5) LETTER-FORM NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Danny R. Lockhart and request for pro se handbook. (taq) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/22/2018)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/04/2018)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (taq) (Modified on 10/10/2018 to replace image) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/04/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Mail sent to Danny R. Lockhart #10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. Returned: Return to Sender - Unclaimed - Unable to Forward. (cwm) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/28/2018. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Mail sent to Danny R. Lockhart #9 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT - Returned: Return to Sender - Unclaimed - Unable to Forward. (cwm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Form 1983 Forms) Notice and forms mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR per RWT Chambers (BS).(cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00995. (cwm) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE directing that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division, P.O. Box 2857, Clarksburg, West Virginia 26302, for additional proceedings; the plaintiff is directed to address any further information concerning this matter to that court, which will assign the case a new case number and take any further action as the court deems necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 10/10/2018. (cc: plaintiff) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. ERROR: Pages of image out of order. CORRECTION: Image corrected and replaced. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER to Danny R. Lockhart, from Rory L. Perry II dated 6/26/2018, re: #5 letter-form notice of change of address and request for pro se handbook. (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER-FORM NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Danny R. Lockhart and request for pro se handbook. (taq) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia (WVSD) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, June 11, 2018. The WVSD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00pm (noon) on Friday, June 8, 2018 until 6:00am on Monday, June 11, 2018. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVSD e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after June 11, 2018. Instructions for linking your account can be found at #http://www.wvsd. uscourts.gov/pdfs/NextGen/WVSD_Link_PACER_to_CM-ECF.pdf. If you have any additional questions please call the WVSD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304)-347-3111. (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION by Danny R. Lockhart (Attachment: #1 Resident Balance Statement) (taq) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (taq) (Modified on 10/10/2018 to replace image) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION by Danny R. Lockhart to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (taq) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/10/2018.] (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.