This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 at 07:45:48 (UTC).

JATC Fund v. Knustrom

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 JATC Fund filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Knustrom. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney and Leonard T Strand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Leonard T Strand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Local Union No 125 JATC Fund

Defendant

Clinton Knustrom

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Ellen Germaine

Attorney at Germaine Law Firm, PLLC

600 Third Street Se, Suite 200, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CLERK'S Default Entry as to Defendant Clinton Knustrom: Granting #7 Motion for Default Entry. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/18. (Copy w/NEF mailed to Defendant Clinton Knustrom) (kfs) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Default Entry against Clinton Knustrom by Plaintiff Local Union No 125 JATC Fund (Germaine, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local Union No 125 JATC Fund. Clinton Knustrom served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Germaine, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#4

(#4) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Local Union No 125 JATC Fund (Germaine, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

3 #1

New Civil Case Packet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Defendant Clinton Knustrom****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION****(Attachment #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kfs) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge: Check Status ddl 10/24/2018 (kfs) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Clinton Knustrom (Filing Fee $400: Receipt Number: 0862-2781269) by Plaintiff Local Union No 125 JATC Fund: Scheduling Report ddl 12/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Exhibit 1 #3 Exhibit 2 #4 Exhibit 3) (Germaine, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S Default Entry as to Defendant Clinton Knustrom: Granting #7 Motion for Default Entry. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/18. (Copy w/NEF mailed to Defendant Clinton Knustrom) (kfs) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as the case presider: No conflicts identified (kfs) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Default Entry against Clinton Knustrom by Plaintiff Local Union No 125 JATC Fund (Germaine, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local Union No 125 JATC Fund. Clinton Knustrom served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Germaine, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (DOCKETED IN ERROR: Attorney to refile): Certificate of Service filed by Local Union No 125 JATC Fund RE: #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Complaint #2 Notice of MJ Assignment #3 Summons and Civil Case Packet) (Germaine, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (kfs) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Local Union No 125 JATC Fund (Germaine, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2018 (kfs) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Defendant Clinton Knustrom****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION****(Attachment #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kfs) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge: Check Status ddl 10/24/2018 (kfs) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added: No conflicts identified as to judge, parties and attorneys (kfs) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Clinton Knustrom (Filing Fee $400: Receipt Number: 0862-2781269) by Plaintiff Local Union No 125 JATC Fund: Scheduling Report ddl 12/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Exhibit 1 #3 Exhibit 2 #4 Exhibit 3) (Germaine, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.