This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2018 at 07:33:07 (UTC).

Lobaina-Frometa et al v. Brown et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 Lobaina-Frometa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory F. VanTatenhove and Edward B. Atkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

Referral Judge

Edward B. Atkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Susana Guevara

Delvis Lobaina-Frometa

Defendants

Eric Lynn Brown

Adam D. Kenerly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Andrew Wallitsch

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan - Louisville

420 W. Liberty Street, Suite 260

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

John F. Carroll, Jr.

Attorney at Whitten Donnell

700 N. Hurstbourne Parkway, Suite 112

Louisville, KY 40222

William Thomas Donnell

Attorney at Whitten Donnell

700 N. Hurstbourne Parkway, Suite 112

Louisville, KY 40222

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Req. for Doc.s and Interrogatories and by Eric Lynn Brown (Donnell, William) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (CBD). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Susana Guevara, Delvis Lobaina-Frometa of service of discovery to Defendants, Eric Lynn Brown d/b/a E&J Trucking and Adam D. Kenerly (Wallitsch, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Susana Guevara, Delvis Lobaina-Frometa of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Wallitsch, Scott) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit Policy Information

#8

(#8) FIRST DISCLOSURES by Eric Lynn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Information)(Donnell, William) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures ddl 11/9/2018. Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Fact discovery ddl 5/15/2019. Expert Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 9/16/2019. Motions to join additional parties or amend pleadings due from Pltf 1/15/2019 from Dft 2/1/2019. Pretrial Filings due by 11/25/2019. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 12/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in FRANKFORT, Ky. JURY TRIAL set for 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT, Ky. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/1/2018.(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#6

(#6) FIRST REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Donnell, William) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#5

(#5) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eric Lynn Brown.(Donnell, William) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). 2. At the time of the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3. No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eric Lynn Brown, Adam D. Kenerly.(Donnell, William) Modified on 10/5/2018 (SCD). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #4

State Court Record Complaint

1 #2

State Court Record Summons as to Brown

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-904. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4183339), filed by Adam D. Kenerly, Eric Lynn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Summons as to Brown, #3 State Court Record Summons as to Kenerly, #4 State Court Record Complaint)(CBD) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Req. for Doc.s and Interrogatories and by Eric Lynn Brown (Donnell, William) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (CBD). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by Susana Guevara, Delvis Lobaina-Frometa of service of discovery to Defendants, Eric Lynn Brown d/b/a E&J Trucking and Adam D. Kenerly (Wallitsch, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Susana Guevara, Delvis Lobaina-Frometa of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Wallitsch, Scott) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FIRST DISCLOSURES by Eric Lynn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Information)(Donnell, William) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures ddl 11/9/2018. Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Fact discovery ddl 5/15/2019. Expert Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 9/16/2019. Motions to join additional parties or amend pleadings due from Pltf 1/15/2019 from Dft 2/1/2019. Pretrial Filings due by 11/25/2019. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 12/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in FRANKFORT, Ky. JURY TRIAL set for 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT, Ky. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/1/2018.(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (CBD) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIRST REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Donnell, William) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eric Lynn Brown.(Donnell, William) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). 2. At the time of the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3. No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #3 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal. (SCD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eric Lynn Brown, Adam D. Kenerly.(Donnell, William) Modified on 10/5/2018 (SCD). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-904. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4183339), filed by Adam D. Kenerly, Eric Lynn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Summons as to Brown, #3 State Court Record Summons as to Kenerly, #4 State Court Record Complaint)(CBD) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.