This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2018 at 07:43:40 (UTC).

L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C. v. Libyan Foreign Bank

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 L M S Commodities D M C C filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Libyan Foreign Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00679

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.

Defendant

Libyan Foreign Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan L. Carlson

Attorney at Law Offices of Alan Carlson

7500 Lohman Ford Rd.

Lago Vista, TX 78764

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint (Filing Fee of $400.00 is DUE)( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 100033774), filed by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits: Copies of Judgment and Translation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt No. 100033774)(afd) Modified on 8/14/2018 to correct document title (afd). (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#2

(#2) Filing fee received in the amount of $400, receipt number 100033899. (lt) Modified on 9/27/2018 (lt). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#5

(#5) DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Alan L. Carlson: re #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. (lt) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.. Corrected (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.. (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt No. 100033774

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENT (Certified Copies) to #1 Complaint, by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(lt) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

3 #1

Attachement 1

3 #3

Attachment 3

1 #1

Exhibit s

3 #2

Attachment 2

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Libyan Foreign Bank. (lt) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Libyan Foreign Bank. (lt) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.. Corrected (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Alan L. Carlson: re #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. (lt) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.. (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENT (Certified Copies) to #1 Complaint, by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(lt) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee received in the amount of $400, receipt number 100033899. (lt) Modified on 9/27/2018 (lt). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint (Filing Fee of $400.00 is DUE)( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 100033774), filed by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits: Copies of Judgment and Translation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt No. 100033774)(afd) Modified on 8/14/2018 to correct document title (afd). (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Unassigned. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.