This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2018 at 07:42:51 (UTC).

LIVING THE DREAM ALASKA, LLC v. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 LIVING THE DREAM ALASKA, LLC filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Sedwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00235

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIVING THE DREAM ALASKA, LLC

Defendant

MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James J. Davis, Jr.

Attorney at Northern Justice Project

310 K Street, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

Goriune Dudukgian

Attorney at Northern Justice Project

310 K Street, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

Defendant Attorney

John B. Thorsness

Attorney at Clapp, Peterson, Tiemessen, Thorsness & Johnson, LLC (Anch)

711 H. Street, Suite 620

Anchorage, AK 99501-3454

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2019. Discovery due by 10/21/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/4/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2019. See document for all other deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 11/20/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dudukgian, Goriune) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. (Thorsness, John) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#7

(#7) INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

6 #7

Exhibit G

6 #6

Exhibit F

6 #5

Exhibit E

6 #4

Exhibit D

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Thorsness, John) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/16/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (Thorsness, John) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, First Judicial District, case number 1JU-18-00901CI. ( Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC014) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/5/2018 (BJK, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2019. Discovery due by 10/21/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/4/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2019. See document for all other deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 11/20/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dudukgian, Goriune) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. (Thorsness, John) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Thorsness, John) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/16/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (Thorsness, John) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, First Judicial District, case number 1JU-18-00901CI. ( Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC014) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/5/2018 (BJK, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less