This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2018 at 07:52:00 (UTC).

Lisle v. Prentince et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 Lisle filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Prentince. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Darrow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01395

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven D Lisle, Jr.

Menard, IL 62259

Defendants

Edward P Barr

Susan Prentince

Evans

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Sierra D Senor-Moore

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

500 South Second Street

Springfield, IL 62706

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven D Lisle, Jr. Edward P Barr waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019; Evans waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019; Susan Prentince waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sierra D Senor-Moore on behalf of Edward P Barr, Evans, Susan Prentince (Senor-Moore, Sierra) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Jennifer Robinson at Pontiac on 12/10/2018 for all defendants. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 12/10/2018. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MERIT REVIEW OPINION Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 12/10/2018. See written Order. Pursuant to its merit review of the complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the Court finds the Plaintiff has alleged enough facts to proceed with the following two claims: (1) an Eighth Amendment claim against Defendants Prentice, Evans, and Barr regarding the method and manner they chose to conduct the April 2018 strip search and (2) a retaliation claim against Prentice and Evans for retaliatory actions taken against Plaintiff for exercising his First Amendment rights. The claim is stated against the Defendants in their individual capacities only. The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act.The Clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendants pursuant to the standard procedures.Plaintiffs motion for counsel #3 is denied, with leave to renew upon demonstrating that he made attempts to retain counsel. Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). This typically requires writing to several attorneys and attaching the responses. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 12/6/18. Due to the unavailability of the plaintiff, the merit review hearing set for December 6, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., is VACATED. The clerk is directed to recall the writ issued for plaintiff's appearance. A written order will be entered on plaintiff's complaint. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Telephone WRIT issued for Steven D Lisle Jr on 12/6/2018 at 1:30 PM for a Merit Review Hearing before Judge Baker. (Faxed and Mailed to Menard CC.) (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/29/2018. A merit review hearing is set for December 6, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER - Entered by Judge Sara Darrow on 11/1/2018 granting #2 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff`s trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Clerk of Court requesting Trust Fund Legers. (Sent via conventional mail to Trust Fund Dept at Menard.) (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 211 19th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 11/15/2018. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Steven D Lisle, Jr. Responses due by 11/9/2018 (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Steven D Lisle, Jr.(ME, ilcd) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven D Lisle, Jr.(ME, ilcd) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVANS is a litigant