This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2018 at 07:11:20 (UTC).

Lisa R. Del Real Schreihart v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Lisa R Del Real Schreihart filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Nancy A Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-01334

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Fernando M. Olguin

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa R. Del Real Schreihart

Defendant

Nancy A Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bill LaTour

Attorney at Law Offices of Bill LaTour

1420 East Cooley Drive Suite 100

Colton, CA 92324

Defendant Attorneys

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Assistant US Attorney SA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

411 West 4Th Street Suite 8000

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4599

Marla K Letellier

Attorney at SAUSA - Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Consent CV-11) (clee) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

9 #1

Consent CV-11

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #5 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (clee) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • (#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV18-1334 SK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Nancy A Berryhill(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa R. Del Real Schreihart, upon Defendant Nancy A Berryhill served on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to FLABIA DE LA ROSA. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to CLERK. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to CIVIL PROCESS CLERK. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (LaTour, Bill) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Lisa R. Del Real Schreihart. (LaTour, Bill) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Consent CV-11) (clee) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (clee) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #5 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (clee) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by PLAINTIFF LISA R DEL REAL SCHREIHART. (LaTour, Bill) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF LISA R DEL REAL SCHREIHART, (LaTour, Bill) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by PLAINTIFF LISA R DEL REAL SCHREIHART. (LaTour, Bill) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LISA R DEL REAL SCHREIHART. (LaTour, Bill) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by PLAINTIFF LISA R DEL REAL SCHREIHART. (Attorney Bill LaTour added to party LISA R DEL REAL SCHREIHART(pty:pla))(LaTour, Bill) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.