This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2018 at 06:32:34 (UTC).

Lindsey et al v. C&J Well Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2016 Lindsey filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against C J Well Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Charles S. Miller. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Charles S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scottie Payne

Vikki Nicole Lindsey

Melissa Hopkins

Defendants

C&J Well Services, Inc.

Nabors Drilling USA, LP

Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc.

John Doe, I

C&J Energy Services, Inc.

Nabors Industries, Inc.

Nabors Completion & Production Services Co.

Nabors Corporate Services, Inc.

Superior Well Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jared Walter Gietzen(Designation Retained)

Mark V. Larson(Designation Retained)

Defendant Attorney

Troy A. Wolf

 

Court Documents

#36

#48

#50

#52

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER: Plaintiffs' response to Motion to Compel Arbitration due by 8/22/2017. Defendants' reply in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration due by 9/22/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2018. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 4/15 /2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 4/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days). Parties shall submit a revised scheduling plan for the court's consideration. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER: The court lifts the stay. A status conference is set for 6/12/2017 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court shall initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 50 replaced on 6/6/2017 to correct date in document. Regenerated NEF.) (rh)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER STAYING CASE by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The 39 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Demand for Stay of Litigation are terminated with the understanding that they can be renewed as necessary at a later date. The 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claims for Punitive Damages is deemed moot. The final pretrial conference set for 10/18/2017 and trial set for 10/30/2017 are cancelled with the understanding that they may be rescheduled as necessary at a later date. (BG)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2017 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less