This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2018 at 07:01:08 (UTC).

Lightwire, LLC v. Spark Industries, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 Lightwire, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Spark Industries, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-05003

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lightwire, LLC

Defendant

Spark Industries, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jayson Singh Sohi

Attorney at Cotman IP Law Group PLC

35 Hugus Alley Suite 210

Pasadena, CA 91103

Daniel C Cotman

Attorney at Cotman IP Law Group PLC

35 Hugus Alley Suite 210

Pasadena, CA 91103

Obi Ian Iloputaife

Attorney at Cotman IP Law Group PLC

35 Hugus Alley Suite 210

Pasadena, CA 91103

Todd Y Brandt

Attorney at Brandt Law Firm

222 North Fredonia Street

Longview, TX 75601

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Todd T. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC, designating Jayson S. Sohi as local counsel #12 . (iv) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Todd Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21881488) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local counsel failed to sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Todd Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21881488) filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Spark Industries, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Todd Y Brandt. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Lightwire, LLC. (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC, (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC. (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21874912 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Jayson Singh Sohi added to party Lightwire, LLC(pty:pla))(Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Todd T. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC, designating Jayson S. Sohi as local counsel #12 . (iv) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Todd Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 6/6/2018, Receipt No. 0973-21881488) filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Todd Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21881488) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local counsel failed to sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Todd Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21881488) filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Spark Industries, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Todd Y Brandt. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC. (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Lightwire, LLC. (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC, (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC. (Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21874912 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lightwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Jayson Singh Sohi added to party Lightwire, LLC(pty:pla))(Sohi, Jayson) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIGHTWIRE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Spark Industries LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Obi Ian Iloputaife

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jayson Singh Sohi