This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2018 at 07:40:52 (UTC).

Lightwire, LLC v. NJoy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 Lightwire, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NJoy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01541

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lightwire, LLC

Defendant

NJoy, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Attorney at O'Kelly Ernst & Joyce, LLC

901 North Market Street, Suite 1000

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer the Complaint to December 14, 2018 - filed by Lightwire, LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Lightwire, LLC. NJoy, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,614,402. (sar) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against NJoy, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2475206.) - filed by Lightwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer the Complaint to December 14, 2018 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: NJoy, Inc. answer due 12/14/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/18/2018. (dlw) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer the Complaint to December 14, 2018 - filed by Lightwire, LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return of Service Executed by Lightwire, LLC. NJoy, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to NJoy, Inc. on 10/5/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,614,402. (sar) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against NJoy, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2475206.) - filed by Lightwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NJOY, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LIGHTWIRE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Pazuniak