This case was last updated from PACER on 05/07/2018 at 07:03:08 (UTC).

Lifted Spirits Distillation, LLC v. State Line Distillery, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 Lifted Spirits Distillation, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against State Line Distillery, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lifted Spirits Distillation, LLC

Defendants

John Mleziva

State Line Distillery, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amanda R. Cefalu

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

60 S. 6Th Street, Suite 3400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Dean Wolske

Attorney at Menn Law Firm, Ltd.

2501 East Enterprise Avenue, P.O. Box 785

Appleton, WI 54912-0785

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER by Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC. (Wolske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/26/2018)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wolske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaint

#7

(#7) Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Wolske, Christopher) Modified on 4/5/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC. (Wolske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher Dean Wolske for Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC. (Wolske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Returned Executed. John Mleziva served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (Cefalu, Amanda) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

1 #9

Exhibit 7. Collection of screenshots

1 #8

Exhibit 6. Wisconsin State Journal article

1 #7

Exhibit 5. USPTO Rejection

1 #6

Exhibit 4. USPTO Provisional Rejection

1 #5

Exhibit 3. Trademark application 87/213185

1 #4

Exhibit 2. Affidavit of Amanda R. Cefalu

1 #3

Exhibit 1. Federal Registration

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2206238.), filed by Lifted Spirits Distillation, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Summons (Case number.), #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - Federal Registration, #4 Exhibit 2 - 2016 Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 3 - Trademark application 87/213185, #6 Exhibit 4 - USPTO Provisional Rejection, #7 Exhibit 5 - USPTO Rejection, #8 Exhibit 6 - Wisconsin State Journal article, #9 Exhibit 7 - Collection of Screenshots) (Cefalu, Amanda) Modified on 3/9/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER by Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC. (Wolske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer due 4/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/23/2018. (jls) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wolske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Answer due 4/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/6/2018. (jls) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Wolske, Christopher) Modified on 4/5/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC. (Wolske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher Dean Wolske for Defendants John Mleziva, State Line Distillery, LLC. (Wolske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Returned Executed. John Mleziva served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (Cefalu, Amanda) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Returned Executed. State Line Distillery, LLC served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (Cefalu, Amanda) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to John Mleziva and State Line Distillery, LLC. (jls) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2206238.), filed by Lifted Spirits Distillation, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Summons (Case number.), #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - Federal Registration, #4 Exhibit 2 - 2016 Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 3 - Trademark application 87/213185, #6 Exhibit 4 - USPTO Provisional Rejection, #7 Exhibit 5 - USPTO Rejection, #8 Exhibit 6 - Wisconsin State Journal article, #9 Exhibit 7 - Collection of Screenshots) (Cefalu, Amanda) Modified on 3/9/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less