This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2017 at 04:01:52 (UTC).

Lietzke v. County of Montgomery et al (MAG+)

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 Lietzke filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Montgomery MAG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray M. Borden and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-00714

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gray M. Borden

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bill Lietzke

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendants

Reese McKinney

County of Montgomery

D. T. Marshall

 

Court Documents

14 #1

District of Maine Certified Docket Sheet

#14

(#14) Case transferred in from District of Maine; Case Number 2:17-cv-329-JDL; Original file, certified copy of transfer order and certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 District of Maine Certified Docket Sheet) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

#12

(#12) ORDER, entered in District of Maine, ACCEPTING 6 Report and Recommended Decision. Signed by Judge Jon D. Levy. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

#13

(#13) LETTER filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Entry of Default, MOTION for Default Judgment, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke; Responses due by 10/19/2017. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Disqualify and Reassign, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

#5

(#5) ORDER, entered in District of Maine, granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. Rich, III. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

#4

(#4) LETTER from District of Maine Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Interrogatories

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against County of Montgomery, D. T. Marshall, Reese McKinney, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (Attachments: #1 Interrogatories, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Case transferred in from District of Maine; Case Number 2:17-cv-329-JDL; Original file, certified copy of transfer order and certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 District of Maine Certified Docket Sheet) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER, entered in District of Maine, ACCEPTING 6 Report and Recommended Decision. Signed by Judge Jon D. Levy. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) LETTER filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER, entered in District of Maine, denying #8 MOTION for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Jon D. Levy. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, entered in District of Maine, denying #8 MOTION for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Jon D. Levy. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, entered in District of Maine, denying #7 MOTION to Disqualify and Reassign. Signed by Judge Jon D. Levy.(wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Entry of Default, MOTION for Default Judgment, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke; Responses due by 10/19/2017. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Disqualify and Reassign, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION, entered in District of Maine, re #1 Complaint; Objections to R&R due by 9/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. Rich, III. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #5 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER, entered in District of Maine, granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. Rich, III. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from District of Maine Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #2 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against County of Montgomery, D. T. Marshall, Reese McKinney, filed in District of Maine by Bill Lietzke. (Attachments: #1 Interrogatories, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less