This case was last updated from PACER on 09/24/2019 at 17:29:41 (UTC).

Lexington Insurance Company v. American Homepatient, Inc. (PLR3)

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Lexington Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Homepatient, Inc PLR3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00350

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lexington Insurance Company

Defendant

American Homepatient, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George B Green, Jr

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC

3344 Peachtree Road, Ne, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30326

John C Bonnie

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC

3344 Peachtree Road, Ne, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30326

Nancy F Rigby

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC

3344 Peachtree Road, Ne, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30326

Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence P Ingram

Attorney at Freeborn & Peters, LLP (FL)

201 N. Franklin Street, Suite 3550

Tampa, FL 33602

William B Jakes, III

Attorney at Howell & Fisher PLLC

300 James Robertson Parkway, Court Square Building

Nashville, TN 37201-1107

Jessica Kirkwood Alley

Attorney at Freeborn & Peters, LLP (FL)

201 N. Franklin Street, Suite 3550

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#1

(#7) NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company re #2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac), #1 Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet (Green, George) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #5

Other Summons to American Homepatient, Inc.

1 #3

Exhibit C - Lexington GL Policy

1 #4

Exhibit D - Lexington Umbrella Policy

1 #1

Exhibit A - Presswood Action

1 #2

Exhibit B - Geismann Action

#2

(#7) NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company re #2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac), #1 Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet (Green, George) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to American Homepatient, Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/24/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#23

(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay filed by American Homepatient, Inc.. (Kirkwood Alley, Jessica) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay by American Homepatient, Inc.. (Ingram, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#22

(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Bonnie, John) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#21

(#21) Certificate of Corporate Interest by American Homepatient, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lincare Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Linde PLC for American Homepatient, Inc.. (Kirkwood Alley, Jessica) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

19 #1

Other Proposed Order

#19

(#19) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Briefing Deadlines by American Homepatient, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Jakes, William) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#18

(#18) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay (Declaration of Christian M. Gunneson) filed by American Homepatient, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ingram, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

18 #3

Exhibit C

18 #4

Exhibit D

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay filed by American Homepatient, Inc.. (Kirkwood Alley, Jessica) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Bonnie, John) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Certificate of Corporate Interest by American Homepatient, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lincare Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Linde PLC for American Homepatient, Inc.. (Kirkwood Alley, Jessica) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Pamela L. Reeves on 12/12/2018.(CRP) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Briefing Deadlines by American Homepatient, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Jakes, William) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay (Declaration of Christian M. Gunneson) filed by American Homepatient, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ingram, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay filed by American Homepatient, Inc.. (Ingram, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay by American Homepatient, Inc.. (Ingram, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 10/26/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 10/29/2018 to note c/m to Lawrence P Ingram w/ECF info (ADA). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica Kirkwood Alley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3800289.) filed by American Homepatient, Inc., #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence Ingram ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3800280.) filed by American Homepatient, Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIUH LLC, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. (Green, George) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company re #2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac), #1 Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet (Green, George) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/24/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/24/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/24/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Lexington Insurance Company. (ABF) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to American Homepatient, Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint, : requirements due by 8/29/2018. Civil Cover Sheet not submitted.(ABF) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT /Petition for Declaratory Judgment against American Homepatient, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3752860.), filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Presswood Action, #2 Exhibit B - Geismann Action, #3 Exhibit C - Lexington GL Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Lexington Umbrella Policy, #5 Other Summons to American Homepatient, Inc.)(Green, George) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.