This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2018 at 07:39:48 (UTC).

Lewis v. Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 Lewis filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey L. Viken and Daneta Wollmann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-05071

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey L. Viken

Referral Judge

Daneta Wollmann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aimee Lewis

Rapid City, SD 57709

Defendants

Janice Gednalske

Rapid City, SD 57703

Joshua Gednalske

Rapid City, SD 57703

Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System

Debra Watson

Dwayne Gednalske

Rapid City, SD 57703

Pennington County Sheriff's Department

Rapid City Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert B. Anderson

Attorney at May, Adam, Gerdes & Thompson

Po Box 160, 224-8803, Fax: 224-6289

Pierre, SD 57501

Benjamin D. Tronnes

Attorney at Bangs McCullen Law Firm

333 West Boulevard, Suite 400, Po Box 2670

Rapid City, SD 57701

Daniel F. Duffy

Attorney at Bangs, McCullen, Butler, Foye & Simmons

Po Box 2670, 343-1040, Fax: 343-1503

Rapid City, SD 57709

Rebecca L. Mann

Attorney at Gunderson, Palmer, Nelson & Ashmore, LLP

506 Sixth Street, Po Box 8045

Rapid City, SD 57709-8045

J. Crisman Palmer

Attorney at Gunderson, Palmer, Goodsell & Nelson, LLP

Po Box 8045, 342-1078, Fax: 342-9503

Rapid City, SD 57709-8045

Robert J. Galbraith

Attorney at Nooney & Solay

Po Box 8030

Rapid City, SD 57709

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

#35

#32

#29

#27

#15

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, #15 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to FRCP12(B), #27 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, #29 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, #32 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, and #35 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim. Objections to R&R due by 12/12/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann on 11/28/18. (Wollmann, Daneta) (mailed to Plaintiff at PO Box and N. Lacrosse St. address) Modified on 11/28/2018 (TAL). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Aimee Lewis re #1 Complaint. (SLT) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Aimee Lewis re #1 Complaint and #39 Supplement. (SLT) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SUPPLEMENT. (SLW) Modified on 11/21/2018 to restrict to case participants (names juvenile) (SLW). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #1 Supplement with Defendant's signature) (SLT). (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION and Pleading of Plaintiff - Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al. filed by Debra Watson. (Duffy, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION and Pleading of Plaintiff - Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al. by Aimee Lewis. (SLW) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MEMORANDUM in Support re #35 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rapid City Police Department. (Galbraith, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Rapid City Police Department. (Galbraith, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) OBJECTION by Plaintiff Aimee Lewis re #22 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Attachment: Order of Referral) (KLE) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REDACTED DOCUMENT by Aimee Lewis. Redacted version of previously filed document #21 MOTION and Pleading of Plaintiff- Seventh Circuit Court-South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al re #1 Complaint. (KLE) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE as to Debra Watson served on 10/3/18. (SST) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE OF DOC. 7) RETURN OF SERVICE as to Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System served on 10/3/18. (SST) Modified Docket Text on 10/10/2018 (DLC). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE as to Rapid City Police Department served on 10/3/18. (SST) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE as to Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System served on 10/3/18. (SST) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System. (Anderson, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case LETTER with enclosed Docket Sheet, copy of Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and CM/ECF Pro Se Litigant Application Form sent by Clerk's Office to Aimee Lewis. (SLT) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Dwayne Gednalske, Janice Gednalske, Joshua Gednalske, Pennington County Sheriff's Department, Rapid City Police Department, Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System, Debra Watson. 7 original summons, 8 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff via hand-delivery at case filing. (SLT) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing Fee Received from Aimee Lewis. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #SDX500005450. (SLT) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLT) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Aimee Lewis. (SLT) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pennington County Sheiff's Office is a litigant

Latest cases where Rapid City Police Dept is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin D. Tronnes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel F. Duffy