This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2018 at 07:41:07 (UTC).

Lewandowski v. GE Healthcare Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2018 Lewandowski filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GE Healthcare Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01641

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sean Lewandowski

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

General Electric Company

GE Healthcare Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle John McGee

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer, P.A.

123 Justison Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Todd A. Walburg

Margot Cutter

Curtis Brooks Cutter

Defendant Attorneys

Victor William Scarpato, III

Attorney at Wheeler, Trigg, O'Donnell LLP

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202

Michael Caulfield Dalton

Attorney at Dalton & Associates P.A.

1106 West Tenth Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Bartholomew J. Dalton

Attorney at Dalton & Associates P.A.

1106 West Tenth Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company.(Dalton, Michael) Modified on 12/10/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#3

SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Brooks Cutter, Esq. and Margot P. Cutter, Esq., filed by Sean Lewandowski. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/26/2018. (nms) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

3 #2

Certification of Margot P. Cutter, Esq.

3 #1

Certification of C. Brooks, Cutter, Esq.

4 #1

Certification of Todd A. Walburg

#4

SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd A. Walburg, filed by Sean Lewandowski. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/16/2018. (nms) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. O'Donnell, Esq., James E. Hooper, Jr., Esq., and Jeremy A. Moseley, Esq. - filed by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael L. O'Donnell, Esq., #2 Certification of James E. Hooper, Jr., Esq., #3 Certification of Jeremy A. Moseley, Esq.)(Dalton, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

16 #1

Certification of Michael L. O'Donnell, Esq.

16 #2

Certification of James E. Hooper, Jr., Esq.

16 #3

Certification of Jeremy A. Moseley, Esq.

#15

(#15) ORDER Granting #14 APPLICATION of Attorney to Appear as Counsel for Defendant Without Association With Delaware Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/11/2018. (nms) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) APPLICATION of Attorney to Appear as Counsel for Defendant Without Association With Delaware Counsel, by Victor William Scarpato, III on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarpato, Victor) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#13

(#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by McKesson Corporation. (Scarpato, Victor) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, by McKesson Corporation.(Scarpato, Victor) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Dalton, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. O'Donnell, Esq., James E. Hooper, Jr., Esq., and Jeremy A. Moseley, Esq., filed by General Electric Company, GE Healthcare Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/13/2018. (nms) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. O'Donnell, Esq., James E. Hooper, Jr., Esq., and Jeremy A. Moseley, Esq. - filed by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael L. O'Donnell, Esq., #2 Certification of James E. Hooper, Jr., Esq., #3 Certification of Jeremy A. Moseley, Esq.)(Dalton, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER Granting #14 APPLICATION of Attorney to Appear as Counsel for Defendant Without Association With Delaware Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/11/2018. (nms) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 14 has been recoded to reflect the filing is a motion. (nms) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) APPLICATION of Attorney to Appear as Counsel for Defendant Without Association With Delaware Counsel, by Victor William Scarpato, III on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarpato, Victor) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by McKesson Corporation. (Scarpato, Victor) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, by McKesson Corporation.(Scarpato, Victor) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Dalton, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company.(Dalton, Michael) Modified on 12/10/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Bartholomew J. Dalton on behalf of GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company (Dalton, Bartholomew) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to GE Healthcare Inc. on 11/19/2018; General Electric Company on 11/19/2018; McKesson Corporation on 11/19/2018. (sar) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd A. Walburg, filed by Sean Lewandowski. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/16/2018. (nms) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd A. Walburg - filed by Sean Lewandowski. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Todd A. Walburg)(McGee, Kyle) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Margot Cutter,Curtis Brooks Cutter for Sean Lewandowski added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Brooks Cutter, Esq. and Margot P. Cutter, Esq., filed by Sean Lewandowski. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/26/2018. (nms) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Brooks Cutter, Esq. and Margot P. Cutter, Esq. - filed by Sean Lewandowski. (Attachments: #1 Certification of C. Brooks, Cutter, Esq., #2 Certification of Margot P. Cutter, Esq.)(McGee, Kyle) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • No Summons Issued. (rwc) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company, McKesson Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2486519.) - filed by Sean Lewandowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.