This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2019 at 07:37:12 (UTC).

Levitt v. Commissioner, Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Levitt filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter J. Messitte and Stephanie A Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-03465

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter J. Messitte

Referral Judge

Stephanie A Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara S Levitt

Chevy Chase, MD 20815

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security

Interested Party

SSA Notify

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Vickie LeDuc

Attorney at US Attorney Office

36 S Charles St Fourth Floor

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER Directing Clerk to correct and issue summonses to the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/19/2018. (c/m 11/19/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara S Levitt. Commissioner, Social Security served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued 60 days as to Commissioner, Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m 11/19/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Directing Clerk to correct and issue summonses to the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/19/2018. (c/m 11/19/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • (#3) Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/14/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Summonses by Barbara S Levitt (Attachments: #1 Summons) (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • (#2) PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Commissioner (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637033361.), filed by Barbara S Levitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix of Attachments, #3 Attachment 1, #4 Attachment 2, #5 Attachment 3, #6 Attachment 4, #7 Attachment 5, #8 Attachment 6, #9 Attachment 7, #10 Attachment 8, #11 Attachment 9, #12 Attachment 10, #13 Attachment 11, #14 Attachment 12, #15 Attachment 13, #16 Attachment 14, #17 Attachment 15) (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.