This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2014 at 11:05:58 (UTC).

Leticia Vega v. Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2014 Leticia Vega filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-04372

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leticia Vega

Defendants

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy J Becker

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

33 South Sixth Street Suite 4530

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Caleb L H Marker

Attorney at Ridout Lyon and Ottoson LLP

555 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 500

Long Beach, CA 90802

Christopher P Ridout

Attorney at Ridout Lyon and Ottoson LLP

555 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 500

Long Beach, CA 90802

Jacob R Rusch

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

33 South Sixth Street Suite 4530

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jason J Thompson

Attorney at Sommers Schwatz PC

One Towne Square 17Th Floor

Southfield, MI 48076

Jesse L Young

Attorney at Sommers Schwatz PC

One Towne Square 17Th Floor

Southfield, MI 48076

Defendant Attorneys

John S Battenfeld

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Rebecca D Eisen

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

Kathy H Gao

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Shannon Bettis Nakabayashi

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

One Market Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#30) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc..(Battenfeld, John) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. Related Case(s): 2:14-CV-03345 (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega, identifying Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#5

(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: REQUEST for Issuance of Summons #5 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Summons Requests - under Category - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: REQUEST for Issuance of Summons #5 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Summons Requests - under Category - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#34

(#34) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Ridout, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

36 #5

Exhibit E

36 #4

Exhibit D

36 #3

Exhibit C

36 #2

Exhibit B

#36

(#36) DECLARATION of Christopher P. Ridout In Support Of MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ridout, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

#37

(#37) DECLARATION of Caleb Marker In Support Of MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

38 #1

Proposed Order

#38

(#38) NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order re MOTION to Certify Class #34 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridout, Christopher) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order re MOTION to Certify Class #34 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridout, Christopher) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) DECLARATION of Caleb Marker In Support Of MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) DECLARATION of Christopher P. Ridout In Support Of MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ridout, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. (Ridout, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Ridout, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • (#33) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court refers counsel to the Courts Scheduling Conference Order found on the Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2014 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. (Nakabayashi, Shannon) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc., identifying Leticia Vega and Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attorney Shannon Bettis Nakabayashi added to party Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nakabayashi, Shannon) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc..(Battenfeld, John) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #28 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Timothy J. Becker on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Christopher P. Ridout as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jason J Thompson for Plaintiff Leticia Vega, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: REQUEST for Issuance of Summons #5 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Summons Requests - under Category - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jp) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega, identifying Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. Related Case(s): 2:14-CV-03345 (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13922197 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Leticia Vega. (Attorney Caleb L H Marker added to party Leticia Vega(pty:pla))(Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less