This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2019 at 07:57:41 (UTC).

Lethco et al v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Lethco filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and J Ronnie Greer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00303

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan K Lee

J Ronnie Greer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandon W. Lethco

Treasure S. Lethco

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Beecher A Bartlett, Jr

Attorney at Kramer, Rayson LLP (Knox)

Po Box 629, 800 South Gay Street, Suite 2500

Knoxville, TN 37929

Jay E Kohlbusch

Attorney at Law Office of Jay E Kohlbusch

11519 Hardin Valley Road

Knoxville, TN 37932

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Nelson Clark

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2500, Po Box 198615

Nashville, TN 37219-8615

John Randolph Bibb, Jr

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2500, Po Box 198615

Nashville, TN 37219-8615

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/4/2019. (AML, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#12

(#12) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/22/2019. (CAT) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bibb, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF CONSENT and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company (Bibb, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/21/2018. (JCK, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

8 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge

#8

(#8) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Bibb, John) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Nelson Clark on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Clark, Ryan) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ford Motor Company. (Bibb, John) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B - demand letter

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Supplement Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/4/2019. (AML, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Scheduling Conference held on 2/1/2019. Scheduling conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC, ) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/22/2019. (CAT) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bibb, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF CONSENT and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company (Bibb, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/21/2018. (JCK, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Bibb, John) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Nelson Clark on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Clark, Ryan) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ford Motor Company. (Bibb, John) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0649-3838854 (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McMinn County Circuit Court, case number 18-CV-371. (Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0649-3838854), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - demand letter)(Bibb, John) Modified on 12/13/2018 to add filing fee amount and receipt (BJL, ). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.