This case was last updated from PACER on 02/22/2018 at 05:57:00 (UTC).

Lester Speights v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 Lester Speights filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lester Speights

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren Aliz Welling

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

2860 Michelle Drive, Suite 220

Irvine, CA 92807

Laurin M. Jacobsen

Attorney at Peiffer Rosca Wolf Abdullah Carr & Kane -LA

Suite 4610, 201 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Daniel John Carr

Attorney at Peiffer Rosca Wolf Abdullah Carr & Kane PLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 4610

New Orleans, LA 70170

Timothy Michael Clark

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

2860 Michelle Drive, Suite 220

Irvine, CA 92807

Defendant Attorneys

Lawton Cole Callihan

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP - New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

William Edward Steimle

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - CA

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - CA

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Diana Cole Surprenant

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP - New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

E. Paige Sensenbrenner

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP - New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

61 #1

*Restricted*

#61

(#61) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:17-cv-07884. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/21/2018)

60 #1

Letter

#60

(#60) Order of MDL Transfer to District of Kentucky Eastern. MDL case number is 2809. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 02/21/2018)

#59

(#59) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2809. (cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 02/21/2018)

#58

(#58) AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation.(cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

#57

(#57) ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/1/2017. (cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

56 #2

Proposed Pleading

#56

(#56) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Callihan, Lawton) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/26/17. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/26/2017)

#8

(#8) RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (36) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (37) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (38) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (39) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (40) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (41) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related in case 3:16-cv-07152-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lester Speights.. (Welling, Lauren) (Filed on 4/17/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2017)

#6

(#58) AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation.(cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/07/2017)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Welling, Lauren) (Filed on 4/6/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/06/2017)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11288732.). Filed byLESTER SPEIGHTS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welling, Lauren) (Filed on 4/4/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2017)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:17-cv-07884. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Order of MDL Transfer to District of Kentucky Eastern. MDL case number is 2809. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2809. (cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation.(cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/1/2017. (cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Callihan, Lawton) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) MOTION before the JPML for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions)(cg) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference, currently set for Wednesday, October 11, 2017, is hereby CANCELLED. A Scheduling Conference will be rescheduled if the Court deems it necessary. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(gec) [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 10/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/15/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/26/17. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (36) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (37) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (38) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (39) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (40) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; granting (41) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related in case 3:16-cv-07152-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lester Speights.. (Welling, Lauren) (Filed on 4/17/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Filed byLester Speights. (Welling, Lauren) (Filed on 4/17/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Welling, Lauren) (Filed on 4/6/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/18/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11288732.). Filed byLESTER SPEIGHTS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welling, Lauren) (Filed on 4/4/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/17/2017.] [Transferred from laed on 2/21/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less