This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2019 at 07:53:38 (UTC).

Lego A/S et al v. ZURU Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Lego A/S filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ZURU Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin W. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02045

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin W. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lego Systems, Inc.

Lego A/S

LEGO Juris A/S

Defendant

ZURU Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melanie Joan Raubeson

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP-HTFD

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06033

Eric J. TeVelde

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP-HTFD

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06033

Elizabeth Ann Alquist

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP-Trmbl St Htfd-CT

242 Trumbull St.

Hartford, CT 06103-1212

Defendant Attorneys

Sandy Theodosiou-Roussas

Attorney at Stockman O'Connor

10 Middle Street, 11Th Floor

Bridgeport, CT 06604

Simon Irving Allentuch

Attorney at Stockman O'Connor PLLC

10 Middle Street, 11Th Floor

New Haven, CT 06604

Nicholas Kurtz

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

55 E. Monroe St., Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

Thomas M. Dunlap

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

8300 Boone Boulevard, Suite 550

Vienna, VA 22182

 

Court Documents

49 #1

Exhibit A

#49

47 #7

Text of Proposed Order

47 #6

Exhibit 1 to Knight Declaration

47 #5

Declaration of Elizabeth Knight

47 #4

Exhibit 3 to Alquist Declaration

47 #2

Exhibit 1 to Alquist Declaration

47 #1

Declaration of Elizabeth Alquist

#46

1 #18

Exhibit R

1 #17

Exhibit Q

1 #16

Exhibit P

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION for Attorney(s) Cortland C. Putbrese to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5152879) by ZURU Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allentuch, Simon) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER: The Motion for Permission to File the Lego Group's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction in Excess of Page Limitation (ECF No. #46 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/6/2019. (Jerjian, O.) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S, Lego Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Alquist, #2 Exhibit 1 to Alquist Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Alquist Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Alquist Declaration, #5 Declaration of Elizabeth Knight, #6 Exhibit 1 to Knight Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(TeVelde, Eric) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S, Lego Systems, Inc.. (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Memorandum in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S, Lego Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Alquist, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration)(TeVelde, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference held on December 20, 2018 before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. Court Reporter: Corinna F. Thompson. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2019. (Thompson, C.) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Dunlap on behalf of ZURU Inc. (Dunlap, Thomas) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER granting #40 Motion for Attorney Laura Seferian to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/31/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/30/2019. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #39 Motion for Attorney Thomas Dunlap to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/31/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/30/2019. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION for Attorney(s) Laura Seferian to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5137169) by ZURU Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allentuch, Simon) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/11/2019. Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2018.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketJudge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S, Lego Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth Alquist, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Declaration, #14 FRCP 65 Certification with Exhibit, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Alquist, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct motion type and restriction (Walker, J.). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 12/13/2018 (Walker, J.). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S, Lego Systems, Inc.. (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S, Lego Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent KIRKBI A/S for LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S. (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Joan Raubeson on behalf of LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S, Lego Systems, Inc. (Raubeson, Melanie) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. TeVelde on behalf of LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S, Lego Systems, Inc. (TeVelde, Eric) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to ZURU Inc.. (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Alquist on behalf of LEGO Juris A/S, Lego A/S, Lego Systems, Inc. (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ZURU Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5084944.), filed by Lego A/S, LEGO Juris A/S, Lego Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less