This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2022 at 06:19:29 (UTC).

Legal Newsline v. Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC

Case Summary

On 08/14/2013 Legal Newsline filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Graham Mullen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:13-CV-00464

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Graham Mullen

 

Party Details

Consolidated Plaintiffs and Appellees

Ford Motor Company

Garrison Litigation Management, Ltd

The Anchor Packing Company

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Everest Reinsurance Company

Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC

Appellant

Legal Newsline

Defendants

Belluck & Fox, LLP

Shein Law Center Ltd

Mark Iola, LLP

Mt. McKinley Insurance Company

Consolidated Defendants

Waters & Kraus

Resolute Management, Inc.

AIU Insurance Company

American Home Assurance Company

Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania

Granite State Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.

Honeywell International, Inc.

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Plaintiff and Appellee Attorneys

E. Duncan Getchell, Jr.

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Karen Elizabeth Sieg

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Kirk Gibson Warner

Attorney at Smith Anderson

2500 Wachovia Capitol Center, Post Office Box 2611

Raleigh, NC 27602-2611

Michael H. Brady

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Garland Stuart Cassada

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.

101 North Tryon Street, Suite 1900

Jonathan C. Krisko

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.

101 N. Tryon St., Ste. 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Richard Charles Worf, Jr.

Attorney at Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.

101 N. Tryon St., Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Alice Sacks Johnston

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

Bny Mellon Center, Suite 5240, 500 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502

Teresa E. Lazzaroni

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP

303 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Charles Brittain Walther

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 3100

Houston, TX 77002-2711

Fred L. Alvarez

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP

One North Franklin St., Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

J. Samuel Gorham, III

Attorney at J. Samuel Gorham, III, Attorney

Post Office Box 3567

Hickory, NC 28603

Tony L. Draper

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP

1001 Mckinney St., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002

D. Blaine Sanders

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.

101 N. Tryon St., Ste. 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Appellant Attorneys

Alan W. Duncan

Attorney at Mullins Duncan Harrell & Russell PLLC

300 North Greene Street, Suite 2000

Greensboro, NC 27401

Andrew May

Attorney at Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Two North Lasalle Street, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60602

Stephen M. Russell, Jr.

Attorney at Van Laningham Duncan PLLC

300 N. Greene St., Suite 850

Greensboro, NC 27401

Steven Pflaum

Attorney at Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Two North Lasalle Street, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60602

Consolidated Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Charles Brittain Walther

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 3100

Houston, TX 77002-2711

Fred L. Alvarez

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP

One North Franklin St., Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

J. Samuel Gorham, III

Attorney at J. Samuel Gorham, III, Attorney

Post Office Box 3567

Hickory, NC 28603

Tony L. Draper

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP

1001 Mckinney St., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002

G. Martin Hunter

Attorney at Shuford Hunter, PLLC

301 S. Mcdowell Street, Suite 1012

Charlotte, NC 28204

Defendant and Consolidated Defendant Attorney

G. Martin Hunter

Attorney at Shuford Hunter, PLLC

301 S. Mcdowell Street, Suite 1012

Charlotte, NC 28204

55 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#91

(#91) ORDER OF RECUSAL.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/22/14. (tob) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

#44

(#90) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER - as to cases forming "Group I" (as listed in this order)(1) the Group I appeals seeking reversal of the bankruptcy court's sealing and exclusion Orders are GRANTED for the reasons discussed herein. To the extent such appeals seek relief beyond such determination, the appeals are otherwise DENIED; (2)the Group I motions seeking to withdraw the reference are denied as MOOT as the impediment which as prevented relief below has been removed; (3) all of the orders of the bankruptcy court appealed from sealing evidence, hearings, transcripts, or filings, or excluding the press or the public from the hearing are REVERSED; such Order and the motions underlying them are REMANDED for further consideration in light of this decision; subject matter jurisdiction over the proceeding appealed from is RESTORED to bankruptcy court. If any party moves upon remand to seal, the bankruptcy court is INSTRUCTED to determine in the first instance the source of the right of access with respect to each document or the testimony of any witness any party proposes or has proposed to be sealed, give the public notice of any such request to seal and a reasonable opportunity to challenge it; (4) All other motions pending in Group I are denied without prejudice as a matter of housekeeping; (5) all Group I cases are SEVERED from this consolidated action and upon administrative reopening are DISMISSED. As to "Group II" (as listed is this order), (1) the Motions to Withdraw the Reference in each of the cases listed in this order are ALLOWED, and the REFERENCE of such cases to the bankruptcy court is WITHDRAWN; (2) the Clerk of Court is instructed to randomly draw one U.S. Magistrate Judge in the Charlotte Division and refer each Group II case to that judge for complete pretrial management in accordance with the court's Order of Reference. (3)all Group II cases are Served from this consolidated action and from each other and shall proceed under the civil district court case numbers previously assigned to them.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/23/2014. (chh) Modified on 7/25/2014 to add text: Denying as Moot motions #16 #18 #25 #29 #30 #31 #32 #33 #34 #36 #37 #38 #39 #41 #43 #45 ; Granting motions Nunc Pro Tunc #27 #35 #40 #42 #44 #46 ; Granting motions #62 #63 #72 #80 . (Entered: 07/23/2014)

#35

(#90) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER - as to cases forming "Group I" (as listed in this order)(1) the Group I appeals seeking reversal of the bankruptcy court's sealing and exclusion Orders are GRANTED for the reasons discussed herein. To the extent such appeals seek relief beyond such determination, the appeals are otherwise DENIED; (2)the Group I motions seeking to withdraw the reference are denied as MOOT as the impediment which as prevented relief below has been removed; (3) all of the orders of the bankruptcy court appealed from sealing evidence, hearings, transcripts, or filings, or excluding the press or the public from the hearing are REVERSED; such Order and the motions underlying them are REMANDED for further consideration in light of this decision; subject matter jurisdiction over the proceeding appealed from is RESTORED to bankruptcy court. If any party moves upon remand to seal, the bankruptcy court is INSTRUCTED to determine in the first instance the source of the right of access with respect to each document or the testimony of any witness any party proposes or has proposed to be sealed, give the public notice of any such request to seal and a reasonable opportunity to challenge it; (4) All other motions pending in Group I are denied without prejudice as a matter of housekeeping; (5) all Group I cases are SEVERED from this consolidated action and upon administrative reopening are DISMISSED. As to "Group II" (as listed is this order), (1) the Motions to Withdraw the Reference in each of the cases listed in this order are ALLOWED, and the REFERENCE of such cases to the bankruptcy court is WITHDRAWN; (2) the Clerk of Court is instructed to randomly draw one U.S. Magistrate Judge in the Charlotte Division and refer each Group II case to that judge for complete pretrial management in accordance with the court's Order of Reference. (3)all Group II cases are Served from this consolidated action and from each other and shall proceed under the civil district court case numbers previously assigned to them.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/23/2014. (chh) Modified on 7/25/2014 to add text: Denying as Moot motions #16 #18 #25 #29 #30 #31 #32 #33 #34 #36 #37 #38 #39 #41 #43 #45 ; Granting motions Nunc Pro Tunc #27 #35 #40 #42 #44 #46 ; Granting motions #62 #63 #72 #80 . (Entered: 07/23/2014)

34 #1

Memorandum in Support

34 #34

Main Document

#25

(#61) RESPONSE in Support re #25 MOTION to Intervene Coltect Industries Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Intervene by Coltec Industries, Inc.. (Nebrig, Mark) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

29 #1

Memorandum in Support

29 #29

Main Document

#80

(#90) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER - as to cases forming "Group I" (as listed in this order)(1) the Group I appeals seeking reversal of the bankruptcy court's sealing and exclusion Orders are GRANTED for the reasons discussed herein. To the extent such appeals seek relief beyond such determination, the appeals are otherwise DENIED; (2)the Group I motions seeking to withdraw the reference are denied as MOOT as the impediment which as prevented relief below has been removed; (3) all of the orders of the bankruptcy court appealed from sealing evidence, hearings, transcripts, or filings, or excluding the press or the public from the hearing are REVERSED; such Order and the motions underlying them are REMANDED for further consideration in light of this decision; subject matter jurisdiction over the proceeding appealed from is RESTORED to bankruptcy court. If any party moves upon remand to seal, the bankruptcy court is INSTRUCTED to determine in the first instance the source of the right of access with respect to each document or the testimony of any witness any party proposes or has proposed to be sealed, give the public notice of any such request to seal and a reasonable opportunity to challenge it; (4) All other motions pending in Group I are denied without prejudice as a matter of housekeeping; (5) all Group I cases are SEVERED from this consolidated action and upon administrative reopening are DISMISSED. As to "Group II" (as listed is this order), (1) the Motions to Withdraw the Reference in each of the cases listed in this order are ALLOWED, and the REFERENCE of such cases to the bankruptcy court is WITHDRAWN; (2) the Clerk of Court is instructed to randomly draw one U.S. Magistrate Judge in the Charlotte Division and refer each Group II case to that judge for complete pretrial management in accordance with the court's Order of Reference. (3)all Group II cases are Served from this consolidated action and from each other and shall proceed under the civil district court case numbers previously assigned to them.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/23/2014. (chh) Modified on 7/25/2014 to add text: Denying as Moot motions #16 #18 #25 #29 #30 #31 #32 #33 #34 #36 #37 #38 #39 #41 #43 #45 ; Granting motions Nunc Pro Tunc #27 #35 #40 #42 #44 #46 ; Granting motions #62 #63 #72 #80 . (Entered: 07/23/2014)

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Houston on behalf of Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants (Houston, Andrew) (Entered: 09/18/2013)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Steele Wright on behalf of Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants (Wright, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2013)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Waterbury Moon on behalf of Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants (Moon, Travis) (Entered: 09/18/2013)

2 #2

Appellee Designation J

2 #1

Appellee Designation

2 #2

Main Document

1 #1

Order re: Appeal

1 #1

Main Document

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2014
  • DocketCase reassigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jde) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) ORDER OF RECUSAL.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/22/14. (tob) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER - as to cases forming "Group I" (as listed in this order)(1) the Group I appeals seeking reversal of the bankruptcy court's sealing and exclusion Orders are GRANTED for the reasons discussed herein. To the extent such appeals seek relief beyond such determination, the appeals are otherwise DENIED; (2)the Group I motions seeking to withdraw the reference are denied as MOOT as the impediment which as prevented relief below has been removed; (3) all of the orders of the bankruptcy court appealed from sealing evidence, hearings, transcripts, or filings, or excluding the press or the public from the hearing are REVERSED; such Order and the motions underlying them are REMANDED for further consideration in light of this decision; subject matter jurisdiction over the proceeding appealed from is RESTORED to bankruptcy court. If any party moves upon remand to seal, the bankruptcy court is INSTRUCTED to determine in the first instance the source of the right of access with respect to each document or the testimony of any witness any party proposes or has proposed to be sealed, give the public notice of any such request to seal and a reasonable opportunity to challenge it; (4) All other motions pending in Group I are denied without prejudice as a matter of housekeeping; (5) all Group I cases are SEVERED from this consolidated action and upon administrative reopening are DISMISSED. As to "Group II" (as listed is this order), (1) the Motions to Withdraw the Reference in each of the cases listed in this order are ALLOWED, and the REFERENCE of such cases to the bankruptcy court is WITHDRAWN; (2) the Clerk of Court is instructed to randomly draw one U.S. Magistrate Judge in the Charlotte Division and refer each Group II case to that judge for complete pretrial management in accordance with the court's Order of Reference. (3)all Group II cases are Served from this consolidated action and from each other and shall proceed under the civil district court case numbers previously assigned to them.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/23/2014. (chh) Modified on 7/25/2014 to add text: Denying as Moot motions #16 #18 #25 #29 #30 #31 #32 #33 #34 #36 #37 #38 #39 #41 #43 #45 ; Granting motions Nunc Pro Tunc #27 #35 #40 #42 #44 #46 ; Granting motions #62 #63 #72 #80 . (Entered: 07/23/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on July 15, 2014 before Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr.. Court Reporter Tracy Dunlap, telephone number 828.771.7217. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (Reporter: Tracy Dunlap, 828-771-7217) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on July 15, 2014 before Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr.. Court Reporter Tracy Dunlap, telephone number 828.771.7217. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (Reporter: Tracy Dunlap, 828-771-7217) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketMinute Entry: Motions hearing held before District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Counsel for parties (announced in court)Garland Cassada, Blaine Sanders, Sara Higgins, Kevin Maclay, Trevor Swett, Elizabeth Sieg, James Sottile, Michael Magner, Daniel Brier, Vineet Bhatia, Richard Worf. Court reporter: Tracy Dunlap. Order to issue. (chh) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) RESPONSE in Support re 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference, 23 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Garlock's Sur-reply by Joseph W. Belluck, Belluck & Fox, LLP, Jordan Fox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Transcript))(Higgins, Sara) (Entered: 06/03/2014). Filed as document #24 in 3:14cv118 (chh) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) RESPONSE in Support re #25 MOTION to Intervene Coltect Industries Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Intervene by Coltec Industries, Inc.. (Nebrig, Mark) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC. (Bledsoe, Louis) Modified on 7/7/2014 (jde). (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER Consolidating Cases. All further pleadings to be docketed to: 3:13cv464. Member Case: 3:14cv116,3:14cv118,3:14cv130 to be administratively closed. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/1/2014. (eef) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan W. Duncan on behalf of Legal Newsline (Duncan, Alan) (Entered: 09/23/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respective Briefs by Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants.Responses due by 10/7/2013 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moon, Travis) (Entered: 09/19/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Houston on behalf of Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants (Houston, Andrew) (Entered: 09/18/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Steele Wright on behalf of Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants (Wright, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Waterbury Moon on behalf of Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants (Moon, Travis) (Entered: 09/18/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketCase reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(blf) (Entered: 09/11/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketTEXT ONLY Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. Briefs are requested to be filed within 14 days from the date of this notice by the Appellant. The Appellee will then have 14 days within which to respond to Appellants brief. This is pursuant to Rule 8009(a) as of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Any extensions of time will be granted only upon a showing of good cause. Appellant Brief due by 9/30/2013. (blf) (Entered: 09/11/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Bankruptcy Appeal Record Certificate of Readiness -designations of parties submitted herewith - documents to be accessed through BK ECF system (Attachments: #1 Appellee Designation, #2 Appellee Designation J)(bkCH) (Entered: 09/10/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. (blf) (Entered: 08/14/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court case number 10-31607, filed by Legal Newsline. (Attachments: #1 Order re: Appeal) (bkCH) (Entered: 08/14/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MT MCKINLEY INS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where WATERS & KRAUS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Garrison Litigation Management Group, Ltd. is a litigant