This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2018 at 07:01:34 (UTC).

Lee v. Ticketmaster L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 Lee filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Ticketmaster L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-05987

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Lee

Defendants

Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.

Ticketmaster L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elaine T. Byszewski

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shaprio LLP

301 N. Lake Avenue, Suite 920

Pasadena, CA 91101

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy L. O'Mara

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel Murray Wall

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Order as Modified by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #22 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#23

(#23) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #21 Stipulation Regarding #20 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. Cases 18-cv-5987-VC, Lee v. Ticketmaster L.L.C. et al., and 18-cv-6750-JD, Ameri v. Ticketmaster LLC. are related. The Ameri case is ordered transferred to Judge Chhabria.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

22 #1

Declaration of Timothy L. O'Mara

#22

(#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy L. O'Mara)(O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

21 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

20 #4

Certificate/Proof of Service

20 #3

Proposed Order

20 #2

Declaration of Christopher B. Campbell

20 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12735908.) filed by Allen Lee. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/4/2018) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/2/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allen Lee.. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/1/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2018) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12722202.). Filed byAllen Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Order as Modified by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #22 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #21 Stipulation Regarding #20 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. Cases 18-cv-5987-VC, Lee v. Ticketmaster L.L.C. et al., and 18-cv-6750-JD, Ameri v. Ticketmaster LLC. are related. The Ameri case is ordered transferred to Judge Chhabria.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy L. O'Mara)(O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding #20 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related) filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 11/13/2018) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Christopher B. Campbell, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 11/12/2018) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #17 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Declaration of Timothy L. O'Mara in Support of #17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed byLive Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint) filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Certificate of Interested Entities by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Media Corporation for Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12735908.) filed by Allen Lee. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/4/2018) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • (#9) REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/2/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allen Lee.. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/1/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2018) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12722202.). Filed byAllen Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less