This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:04:58 (UTC).

LeBlanc v. Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 LeBlanc filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00159

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robyn LeBlanc

Defendants

A.B.C.

Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC

Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC and/or A.B.C. that individual, partnership, profit corporation, corporation, and/or domestic limited liability company doing business as the same at 2902 Peach Orchard Road, Augusta, GA on August 14, 2015 and/or Responsible

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reid V. Sanders

Attorney at Vic Hawk, PC

336 Telfair Street

Augusta, GA 30901

Defendant Attorneys

Brian D. Trulock

Attorney at Bendin, Sumrall & Ladner, LLC

1360 Peachtree Street Ne, One Midtown Plaza, Suite 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Carrie A. Moss

Attorney at Bendin, Sumrall & Ladner, LLC

1360 Peachtree Street Ne, One Midtown Plaza, Suite 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER directing service of the #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/07/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#16

(#16) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this action be remanded to the Superior Court of Richmond County, Georgia, based on lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and this civil action be closed. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/07/2018. (jlh) Modified on 11/8/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 11/07/2018)

15 #3

Exhibit Robyn Leblanc - Deposition Transcript

15 #2

Exhibit Robyn Leblanc - Medical Bills

15 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to #11 Order, filed by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Robyn Leblanc - Medical Bills, #3 Exhibit Robyn Leblanc - Deposition Transcript)(Trulock, Brian) Modified on 11/1/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE: Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials re 12 - 13 Certificates of Service. (jlh) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER directing Defendants to provide sufficient evidence within fourteen days of the date of this Order that the jurisdictional amount is in controversy. (Compliance due by 10/31/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/17/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2018; Discovery due by 2/12/2019; Motions due by 3/14/2019; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/17/2018; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 1/14/2019; and Status Report due by 2/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/17/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trulock, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Reid V. Sanders on behalf of Robyn LeBlanc (Sanders, Reid) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Trulock, Brian) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(Trulock, Brian) Modified on 9/26/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie A. Moss on behalf of Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Moss, Carrie) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#3

(#3) REMOVAL NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. (jlh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC from Superior Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2018RCCV00428, filed by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00; receipt number 113J-2449777.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint; Summons; Pleadings from CA No.: 2017RCCV00300: Complaint, Sheriff's Entry of Service, Answer, Dismissal Without Prejudice; and #2 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh) Modified on 9/19/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER directing service of the #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/07/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this action be remanded to the Superior Court of Richmond County, Georgia, based on lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and this civil action be closed. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/07/2018. (jlh) Modified on 11/8/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to #11 Order, filed by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Robyn Leblanc - Medical Bills, #3 Exhibit Robyn Leblanc - Deposition Transcript)(Trulock, Brian) Modified on 11/1/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE: Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials re 12 - 13 Certificates of Service. (jlh) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER directing Defendants to provide sufficient evidence within fourteen days of the date of this Order that the jurisdictional amount is in controversy. (Compliance due by 10/31/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/17/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2018; Discovery due by 2/12/2019; Motions due by 3/14/2019; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/17/2018; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 1/14/2019; and Status Report due by 2/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/17/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trulock, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Reid V. Sanders on behalf of Robyn LeBlanc (Sanders, Reid) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Trulock, Brian) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(Trulock, Brian) Modified on 9/26/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie A. Moss on behalf of Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Moss, Carrie) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC answer due 9/26/2018; Compliance re #3 Removal Notice due by 9/29/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REMOVAL NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. (jlh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC from Superior Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2018RCCV00428, filed by Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00; receipt number 113J-2449777.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint; Summons; Pleadings from CA No.: 2017RCCV00300: Complaint, Sheriff's Entry of Service, Answer, Dismissal Without Prejudice; and #2 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh) Modified on 9/19/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less