This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 18:26:14 (UTC).

LCV CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC v. NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A. et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 LCV CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark R. Hornak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01645

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark R. Hornak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LCV CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendants

NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A.

COMPAGNIA ITALIANA ENERGIA S.P.A.

DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.

ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alicia M. Schmitt

322 Richland Lane

Pittsburgh, PA 15208

Bruce E. Stanley

Attorney at Stanley & Schmitt PC

2424 Craftmont Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15205

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan D. Marcus

Attorney at Marcus & Shapira LLP

301 Grant Street, 35Th Floor, One Oxford Centre

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Jeremy D. Engle

Attorney at Marcus & Shapira LLP

301 Grant Street, 35Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Susan Jacquemot

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Brian T. Must

Attorney at Metz Lewis Brodman Must O'Keefe LLC

535 Smithfield Street, Suite 800

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Michael J. Dell

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED until 3/15/19. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/6/19. (bdb) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Engle, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Susan Jacquemot to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/21/18. (bdb) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Micahel J. Dell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/21/18. (bdb) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

13 #1

Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice

#13

(#13) MOTION for attorney Susan Jacquemot to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for Deloitte & Touche S.p.A. (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4973628) by DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice) (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

12 #1

Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice

#12

(#12) MOTION for attorney Michael J. Dell to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for Deloitte & Touche S.p.A. (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4973570) by DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice) (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement identifying Aurelia S.r.l. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A.. (Marcus, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#10

(#10) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/17/18. (bdb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Engle, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Consent Filing (Consent to Removal) as to Deloitte & Touche S.p.A. by DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Must on behalf of DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED until 3/15/19. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/6/19. (bdb) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Engle, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Susan Jacquemot to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/21/18. (bdb) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Micahel J. Dell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/21/18. (bdb) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for attorney Susan Jacquemot to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for Deloitte & Touche S.p.A. (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4973628) by DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice) (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for attorney Michael J. Dell to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for Deloitte & Touche S.p.A. (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4973570) by DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice) (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Disclosure Statement identifying Aurelia S.r.l. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A.. (Marcus, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/17/18. (bdb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is now hereby ORDERED that such Motion is GRANTED and the time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED until 2/15/19. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/17/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Engle, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Consent Filing (Consent to Removal) as to Deloitte & Touche S.p.A. by DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Must on behalf of DELOITTE & TOUCHE S.P.A.. (Must, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Marcus on behalf of COMPAGNIA ITALIANA ENERGIA S.P.A., NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A.. (Marcus, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 12/18/2018. (ept) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD 18-13774 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4960784), filed by NUOVA ARGO FINANZIARIA S.P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DELOITTE TOUCHE TOHMATSU SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia M. Schmitt