This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:40:49 (UTC).

LAWSURE v. ASTURIAN GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 LAWSURE filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ASTURIAN GROUP INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY TORRESEN and JOHN C. NIVISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00373

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY TORRESEN

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL LAWSURE

Defendant

ASTURIAN GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER G. MANCUSO

Attorney at ANDREW SCHMIDT LAW PLLC

97 India Street

Portland, ME 04101

Defendant Attorney

GLENN ISRAEL

Attorney at BERNSTEIN SHUR SAWYER & NELSON

100 Middle Street, West Tower, P.O. Box 9729

Portland, ME 04104-5029

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ASTURIAN GROUP INC. (ISRAEL, GLENN) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/21/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/28/2019. Motions due by 4/11/2019. Ready for Trial on 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ASTURIAN GROUP INC.(ISRAEL, GLENN) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ASTURIAN GROUP INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (jwr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ASTURIAN GROUP INC filed by DANIEL LAWSURE. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 12/13/2018) Fee due by 9/17/2018.(jwr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ASTURIAN GROUP INC. (ISRAEL, GLENN) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/21/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/28/2019. Motions due by 4/11/2019. Ready for Trial on 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • SET Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/8/2018. (slg) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ASTURIAN GROUP INC.(ISRAEL, GLENN) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1900502.), filed by DANIEL LAWSURE.(MANCUSO, PETER) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to ASTURIAN GROUP INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (jwr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ASTURIAN GROUP INC filed by DANIEL LAWSURE. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 12/13/2018) Fee due by 9/17/2018.(jwr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less