This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 18:20:45 (UTC).

Laviolette et al v. CBS Corp et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 Laviolette filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CBS Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stefan R. Underhill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-02119

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stefan R. Underhill

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lucinda deRachemont Laviolette

Henry J. Laviolette

Defendants

Foster Wheeler, LLC

Okonite Co

Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc.

Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corporation

General Electric Company

CBS Corp

Ericsson Inc.

Crane Co.

Rockbestos Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Meisenkothen

Attorney at Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

One Century Tower, 265 Church St., 11Th Fl., Po Box 1866

New Haven, CT 06508-1866

Defendant Attorneys

Gerald A. Desimone

Attorney at Danaher Lagnese, PC

21 Oak Street, Suite 700

Hartford, CT 06106

Thomas N. Lyons

Attorney at Danaher Lagnese, PC

21 Oak Street, Suite 700

Hartford, CT 06106

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Co., #8 Protective Order, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Co., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#8

(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/20/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/20/2017.(Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#6

(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/20/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2018 Discovery due by 6/21/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2018 Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Company (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Desimone, Gerald) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Crane Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Pending Motions (Desimone, Gerald) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald A. Desimone on behalf of Crane Company (Desimone, Gerald) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

1 #18

Exhibit 6

1 #12

Exhibit 6 of 6

1 #7

Exhibit 1 of 6

1 #6

Exhibit 3 of 3

1 #5

Exhibit 2 of 3

1 #4

Exhibit 1 of 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Certificate of Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company from JD of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV17-6067570-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4652887, filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 1 of 3, #5 Exhibit 2 of 3, #6 Exhibit 3 of 3, #7 Exhibit 1 of 6, #8 Exhibit 2 of 6, #9 Exhibit 3 of 6, #10 Exhibit 4 of 6, #11 Exhibit 5 of 6, #12 Exhibit 6 of 6, #13 Exhibit 1 of 5, #14 Exhibit 2 of 5, #15 Exhibit 3 of 5, #16 Exhibit 4 of 5, #17 Exhibit 5 of 5, #18 Exhibit 6)(Desimone, Gerald) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Co., #8 Protective Order, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Co., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/20/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/20/2017.(Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/20/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2018 Discovery due by 6/21/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2018 Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketJudge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Company (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Desimone, Gerald) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Crane Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Pending Motions (Desimone, Gerald) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald A. Desimone on behalf of Crane Company (Desimone, Gerald) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company from JD of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV17-6067570-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4652887, filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 1 of 3, #5 Exhibit 2 of 3, #6 Exhibit 3 of 3, #7 Exhibit 1 of 6, #8 Exhibit 2 of 6, #9 Exhibit 3 of 6, #10 Exhibit 4 of 6, #11 Exhibit 5 of 6, #12 Exhibit 6 of 6, #13 Exhibit 1 of 5, #14 Exhibit 2 of 5, #15 Exhibit 3 of 5, #16 Exhibit 4 of 5, #17 Exhibit 5 of 5, #18 Exhibit 6)(Desimone, Gerald) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less