This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 08:07:02 (UTC).

Lauderdale County, Tennessee v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Lauderdale County, Tennessee filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Diane K. Vescovo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02806

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

 

Party Details

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

MALLINCKRODT LLC

MALLINCKRODT PLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

ALLERGAN PLC

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.

TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

ACTAVIS LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration

THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

CEPHALON, INC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Michael J. Fuller, Jr.

Attorney at McHugh Fuller Law Group, PLLC

97 Elias Whiddon Rd.

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2928835), filed by Lauderdale County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil CoverSheet, #2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil CoverSheet

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-69) MDL No. 2804. Signed by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel on 12/6/2018. (agj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-69) MDL No. 2804. Signed by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel on 12/6/2018. (agj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2928835), filed by Lauderdale County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil CoverSheet, #2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.