This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 07:14:42 (UTC).

Lau v. American Eagle Outfitters et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 Lau filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against American Eagle Outfitters. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George B. Daniels and Barbara C. Moses. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-06055

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

Referral Judge

Barbara C. Moses

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gilbert Lau

New York, NY 10156

Defendants

American Eagle Outfitters

Marcle Maverson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ivie A. Guobadia

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (NYC)

900 Third Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Sylvia Jeanine Conley

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (NYC)

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#63

(#63) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER adopting #62 Report and Recommendations re: #60 Motion to Adjourn Conference: Magistrate Judge Moses's Report is ADOPTED. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/30/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

#62

(#62) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO THE HON. GEORGE B. DANIELS re: #60 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from S. Jeanie Conley dated April 2, 2018. filed by Marcle Maverson, American Eagle Outfitters. Defendant American Eagle Outfitters ("American Eagle") consents to the relief sought. Def. Ltr. dated Apr. 2, 2018 (Dkt. No. 60), at 1. (As further set forth in this Order.) As a practical matter, should plaintiff attempt to refile his claims elsewhere, they will likely be deemed time-barred. Nonetheless, given the parties' silence on this point, I recommend that plaintiff's letter-application be GRANTED and that this action be dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2018 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/9/2018) (cf) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#60

(#60) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from S. Jeanie Conley dated April 2, 2018. Document filed by American Eagle Outfitters, Marcle Maverson.(Conley, Sylvia) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#59

(#59) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Gilbert Lau, dated 3/23/18 re: LETTER MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF CIVIL ACTION CLAIM BASE ALREADY PENDING FEDERAL CHARGES PURS. TO AN ACCOMPANYING CODE SECTION, 18:1515(b) AND 18:1001 AND 18:1503. Document filed by Gilbert Lau.(sc) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

#58

(#58) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gilbert Lau, dated 2/20/18 re: NOTIFICATION LETTER THAT IN FACT FEDERAL CRIMINAL COMPLAINT HAS BEEN ON ATTORNEY CONLEY, ESQ. AND ATTORNEY GUOBADIA ESQ. AND ON ELLEN JORDAN, AND THE PLAINTIFF HAS RIGHT TO FILING FEDERAL CRIMINAL CHANGES ON DEFENDANTS BASE AND PURS. TO FALSE STATEMENT STATUTE, 18:1001, OR AN ACCOMPANYING CODE SECTION, 18:1515(b), BASED PUBLIC "COURT" CORRUPTION AND AN ACCOMPANYING CODE SECTION 18:1503 AND/OR 18:1515 ALREADY THE RIGHT FILING FEDERAL CRIMINAL CHARGES WITH THE FBI. Document filed by Gilbert Lau.(sc) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

#57

(#57) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gilbert Lau, dated 3/12/18 re: NOTIFICATION LETTER OF ALREADY THE RIGHT FILING FEDERAL CRIMINAL CHARGES WITH U.S. ATTORNEY OF USDC-SDNY. Document filed by Gilbert Lau.(sc) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

#56

(#56) REPLY AFFIRMATION of Gilbert Lau WITH EXHIBITS OF THE RIGHT TO LETTER TO AND ATTACHED FORMER NOTICE OF MOTION & SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS; re: #45 Letter. Document filed by Gilbert Lau. (sc) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

45 #1

Proposed Amended Complaint

#45

(#55) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE A FEDERAL AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: #45 Letter. Document filed by Gilbert Lau. (sc) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/14/2017) (ama) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

#5

(#5) PRO SE PRETRIAL: Pro se Plaintiff and counsel for all parties are hereby notified that this case is referred to Magistrate Barbara C. Moses, for the purposes of Case Management and Scheduling pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures. If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally. All correspondence to the Court should be addressed to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. Any procedural questions by Pro Se plaintiff should be addressed to the Office of Pro Se Intake Unit at (212) 805-0175. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/14/2017) (ama) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Marcle Maverson, American Eagle Outfitters.(Guobadia, Ivie) Modified on 8/24/2017 (lb). (Entered: 08/11/2017)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ivie A. Guobadia on behalf of Marcle Maverson, American Eagle Outfitters. (Guobadia, Ivie) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Guobadia, Ivie) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of NY County of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 101978-16. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14003871).Document filed by American Eagle Outfitters, Marcle Maverson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guobadia, Ivie) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketTerminate Transcript Deadlines (jwh) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER adopting #62 Report and Recommendations re: #60 Motion to Adjourn Conference: Magistrate Judge Moses's Report is ADOPTED. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/30/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO THE HON. GEORGE B. DANIELS re: #60 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from S. Jeanie Conley dated April 2, 2018. filed by Marcle Maverson, American Eagle Outfitters. Defendant American Eagle Outfitters ("American Eagle") consents to the relief sought. Def. Ltr. dated Apr. 2, 2018 (Dkt. No. 60), at 1. (As further set forth in this Order.) As a practical matter, should plaintiff attempt to refile his claims elsewhere, they will likely be deemed time-barred. Nonetheless, given the parties' silence on this point, I recommend that plaintiff's letter-application be GRANTED and that this action be dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2018 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/9/2018) (cf) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Docket(#61) ORDER The status conference scheduled for today, April 6, 2018, is adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/6/2018)(AFRP) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from S. Jeanie Conley dated April 2, 2018. Document filed by American Eagle Outfitters, Marcle Maverson.(Conley, Sylvia) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Gilbert Lau, dated 3/23/18 re: LETTER MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF CIVIL ACTION CLAIM BASE ALREADY PENDING FEDERAL CHARGES PURS. TO AN ACCOMPANYING CODE SECTION, 18:1515(b) AND 18:1001 AND 18:1503. Document filed by Gilbert Lau.(sc) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gilbert Lau, dated 2/20/18 re: NOTIFICATION LETTER THAT IN FACT FEDERAL CRIMINAL COMPLAINT HAS BEEN ON ATTORNEY CONLEY, ESQ. AND ATTORNEY GUOBADIA ESQ. AND ON ELLEN JORDAN, AND THE PLAINTIFF HAS RIGHT TO FILING FEDERAL CRIMINAL CHANGES ON DEFENDANTS BASE AND PURS. TO FALSE STATEMENT STATUTE, 18:1001, OR AN ACCOMPANYING CODE SECTION, 18:1515(b), BASED PUBLIC "COURT" CORRUPTION AND AN ACCOMPANYING CODE SECTION 18:1503 AND/OR 18:1515 ALREADY THE RIGHT FILING FEDERAL CRIMINAL CHARGES WITH THE FBI. Document filed by Gilbert Lau.(sc) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gilbert Lau, dated 3/12/18 re: NOTIFICATION LETTER OF ALREADY THE RIGHT FILING FEDERAL CRIMINAL CHARGES WITH U.S. ATTORNEY OF USDC-SDNY. Document filed by Gilbert Lau.(sc) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) REPLY AFFIRMATION of Gilbert Lau WITH EXHIBITS OF THE RIGHT TO LETTER TO AND ATTACHED FORMER NOTICE OF MOTION & SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS; re: #45 Letter. Document filed by Gilbert Lau. (sc) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE A FEDERAL AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: #45 Letter. Document filed by Gilbert Lau. (sc) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/14/2017) (ama) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE PRETRIAL: Pro se Plaintiff and counsel for all parties are hereby notified that this case is referred to Magistrate Barbara C. Moses, for the purposes of Case Management and Scheduling pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures. If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally. All correspondence to the Court should be addressed to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. Any procedural questions by Pro Se plaintiff should be addressed to the Office of Pro Se Intake Unit at (212) 805-0175. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/14/2017) (ama) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Marcle Maverson, American Eagle Outfitters.(Guobadia, Ivie) Modified on 8/24/2017 (lb). (Entered: 08/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (kl) (Entered: 08/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (kl) (Entered: 08/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (kl) (Entered: 08/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ivie A. Guobadia. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $900,000,000,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to New York. (kl) (Entered: 08/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ivie A. Guobadia on behalf of Marcle Maverson, American Eagle Outfitters. (Guobadia, Ivie) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Guobadia, Ivie) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of NY County of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 101978-16. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14003871).Document filed by American Eagle Outfitters, Marcle Maverson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guobadia, Ivie) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EAGLE OUTFITTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ivie A. Guobadia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SYLVIA JEANINE CONLEY