This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 at 07:52:42 (UTC).

Larson v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Larson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Schreier and Veronica L. Duffy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04121

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Karen E. Schreier

Veronica L. Duffy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neil T. Larson

Defendant

Nancy Berryhill

Interested Party

Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven R. Pfeiffer

Attorney at Steven R. Pfeiffer, Prof. LLC

2522 West 41St Street, Suite 340

Sioux Falls, SD 57105

Defendant Attorney

Delia M. Druley (USA)

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

Interested Party Attorney

Office of General Counsel - Dallas

Attorney at Social Security Administration

1301 Young Street, Suite A702

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/2/18. (SLW) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/24/18. (JLS) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/2/18. (SLW) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Nancy Berryhill, Neil T. Larson. (MWT) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of Nancy Berryhill. (Druley (USA), Delia) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill in her official capacity. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Nancy Berryhill, #2 AO85)(JLS) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/24/18. (JLS) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Neil T. Larson. (DJP) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Neil T. Larson. (DJP) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.