Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2018 at 07:02:15 (UTC).

Larot v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 Larot filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew G. Schopler and Larry Alan Burns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02381

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrew G. Schopler

Presiding Judge

Larry Alan Burns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessie D. Larot

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Onemain Financial Services, Inc.

Trans Union LLC

Global Payments Check Services, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Pioneer Financial Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin L. Hernandez

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin L. Hernandez

2510 Wigwam Parkway, Suite 206

Henderseon, NV 89074

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Frederick Gosling

Attorney at Jones Day

4655 Executive Drive, Suite 1500

San Diego, CA 92121

Brett B. Goodman

Attorney at Yu Mohandesi LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Donald E Bradley

Attorney at Musick Peeler and Garrett

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1925

Kristapor Vartanian

Attorney at Kabat Chapman & Ozmer LLP

515 S. Flower Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Thomas P Quinn, Jr

Attorney at Nokes and Quinn

410 Broadway, Suite 200

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Proof of Service

#24

(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bradley, Donald) (jdt). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Global Payments Check Services, Inc. Only by Global Payments Check Services, Inc. (Vartanian, Kristapor) (jdt). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Onemain Financial Services, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent OneMain Holdings, Inc. for Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Goodman, Brett) Modified on 11/29/2018 to add corporate parents Springleaf Finance Corporation and Springleaf Finance, Inc. (jdt). (jao). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Goodman, Brett) (jdt). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #18 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Gosling, Michael) (jdt). (jao). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Gosling, Michael) (jdt). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

8 #1

Proof of Service

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Trans Union LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion for Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bradley, Donald) (jdt). (jao). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

7 #1

Proof of Service

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Bradley, Donald) Attorney Donald E Bradley added to party Trans Union LLC (pty:dft). Modified on 11/14/2018 to correct motion event. QC email sent (jdt). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) (jdt). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#5

(#9) ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. #5 ). Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall file its answer by 11/28/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/13/2018. (jdt) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. #3 ). Global Payments shall file its answer by 12/6/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/8/2018. (jdt) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#3

(#4) ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. #3 ). Global Payments shall file its answer by 12/6/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/8/2018. (jdt) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (jao). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Gosling, Michael) (jdt). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • (#25) ORDER (MLG): Due to the Court's schedule, the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are reset to January 23, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. The ENE briefs and joint discovery plan are now due January 16, 2019. All other provisions of this Court's original ENE and CMC notice remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 12/14/2018. (no document attached) (mxa) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bradley, Donald) (jdt). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Global Payments Check Services, Inc. Only by Global Payments Check Services, Inc. (Vartanian, Kristapor) (jdt). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • (#22) ORDER (MLG): On November 28, 2018, the parties contacted the court with dates as ordered. Accordingly, the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are reset to January 7, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. The ENE statements and joint discovery plan are now due January 2, 2019. All other provisions of this Court's original ENE order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 11/28/2018.(no document attached) (mxa) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Onemain Financial Services, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent OneMain Holdings, Inc. for Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Goodman, Brett) Modified on 11/29/2018 to add corporate parents Springleaf Finance Corporation and Springleaf Finance, Inc. (jdt). (jao). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Goodman, Brett) (jdt). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #18 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Gosling, Michael) (jdt). (jao). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Gosling, Michael) (jdt). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER (MLG): The parties' joint motion to reschedule the December 5, 2018 Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference (ECF No. #16 ) is granted. Those hearings are cancelled. By November 28, 2018, The parties must contact Judge Schopler's chambers with agreed-to dates to reset those hearings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 11/26/2018. (no document attached) (mxa) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Continue Related Dates by Jessie D. Larot. (Hernandez, Kevin) (acc). (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Equifax Information Services, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas) (jdt). (jao). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. #5 ). Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall file its answer by 11/28/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/13/2018. (jdt) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Trans Union LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion for Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bradley, Donald) (jdt). (jao). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Bradley, Donald) Attorney Donald E Bradley added to party Trans Union LLC (pty:dft). Modified on 11/14/2018 to correct motion event. QC email sent (jdt). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) (jdt). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Gosling, Michael)Attorney Michael Frederick Gosling added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (jdt). (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. #3 ). Global Payments shall file its answer by 12/6/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/8/2018. (jdt) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Global Payments Check Services, Inc.. (Vartanian, Kristapor)Attorney Kristapor Vartanian added to party Global Payments Check Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (jdt). (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (jao). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Global Payments Check Services, Inc., Onemain Financial Services, Inc., Pioneer Financial Services, Trans Union LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11800657.), filed by Jessie D. Larot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2381-LAB-AGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Hernandez, Kevin)(lrc) (jao). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant