This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:10:49 (UTC).

Larkin et al v. Day et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 Larkin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Day. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02636

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chad Larkin

Genny Larkin

Defendants

Pilgrim Films & Television, L.L.C. d/b/a Pilgrim Media Group and Operations

Discovery, Inc.

Jonathan Day

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Jonathan Weissman

Attorney at RAYBIN & WEISSMAN, P.C.

424 Church Street, Suite 2120

Nashville, TN 37219

Howard Brett Manis

Attorney at THE COCHRAN FIRM-Memphis

One Commerce Square-Memphis, Suite 1700

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorney

Ronna D. Kinsella

Attorney at GLASSMAN EDWARDS WYATT TUTTLE & COX, P.C.

26 N. Second Street

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint, proposed order submitted by Discovery, Inc.. (Kinsella, Ronna) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#22

(#22) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Pilgrim Films & Television, L.L.C. d/b/a Pilgrim Media Group and Operations. (Kinsella, Ronna) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

20 #1

Exhibit Certified Mailer with Signature

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Larkin, Genny Larkin as to Discovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailer with Signature)(Weissman, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by Chad Larkin, Genny Larkin Notice to Reissue Summons to Jonathan Day a/k/a "JJ DaBoss" (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Weissman, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

16 #2

Exhibit Letter from CT Corporation

15 #1

Exhibit Certified Mailer with Signature

#15

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Discovery, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Jonathan Day. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. 9/18/2018 (jld). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER Granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Discovery, Inc.'s answer is due 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/15/2018. (pab) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint, proposed order submitted by Discovery, Inc.. (Kinsella, Ronna) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronna D. Kinsella on behalf of Discovery, Inc. (Kinsella, Ronna) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER Granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Pilgrim Films & Television, L.L.C. d/b/a Pilgrim Media Group and Operations' shall have up to and including 12/14/2018 to respond to the Complaint. No further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/8/2018. (pab) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Pilgrim Films & Television, L.L.C. d/b/a Pilgrim Media Group and Operations has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer did not indicate "proposed order submitted". If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Pilgrim Films & Television, L.L.C. d/b/a Pilgrim Media Group and Operations. (Kinsella, Ronna) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #20 Summons Returned Executed filed by Genny Larkin, Chad Larkin has been filed. For future reference, please note: Summons published as returned should include both pages of summons issued. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Larkin, Genny Larkin as to Discovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailer with Signature)(Weissman, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Alias Summons Issued as to Jonathan Day. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE by Chad Larkin, Genny Larkin Notice to Reissue Summons to Jonathan Day a/k/a "JJ DaBoss" (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Weissman, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Brett Manis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Manis, Howard) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Civil Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-2881268. (Weissman, David) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Pilgrim Films & Television, L.L.C. d/b/a Pilgrim Media Group and Operations. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Discovery, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Jonathan Day. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. 9/18/2018 (jld). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Weissman, David) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less