This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2018 at 07:47:18 (UTC).

Large v. Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 Large filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Gerdau Ameristeel U S Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are H Bruce Guyton and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00318

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Large

Defendant

Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan William Doolan

Attorney at Collins & Doolan, PLLC

422 S. Gay Street, Suite 301

Knoxville, TN 37902

Defendant Attorneys

Emily D Shoda

Attorney at Littler Mendelson (Atl)

3344 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 1500 Tower Place 200

Atlanta, GA 30326

Rachel Ross Rosenblatt

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (Nashville)

333 Commerce Street, Suite 1450

Nashville, TN 37201

Gavin S Appleby

Attorney at Littler Mendelson (Atl)

3344 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 1500 Tower Place 200

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal case (JOINT) by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER, the case management conference in this case, set for September 25, 2018, is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/5/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc. Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED for 9/25/2018, at 01:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 8/8/2018. (CEA) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION (JOINT) Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2018, at 02:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 8/6/2018. (CEA) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#7

(#7) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/03/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Emily D Shoda) (AMP) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/03/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Emily D Shoda) (AMP) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/03/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Emily D Shoda) (AMP) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

4 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Emily D. Shoda ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3734873.) by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

3 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gavin S. Appleby ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3734868.) by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

1 #5

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice to State Court of FIling of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C - Affidavit of Gwen Reichel

1 #2

Exhibit B - Knox County Circuit Court Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal case (JOINT) by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER, the case management conference in this case, set for September 25, 2018, is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/5/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc. Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED for 9/25/2018, at 01:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 8/8/2018. (CEA) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 8/8/2018. (AGA) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION (JOINT) Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2018, at 02:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 8/6/2018. (CEA) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Emily D. Shoda ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3734873.) filed by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc., and #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gavin S. Appleby ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3734868.) filed by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc. . (AMP) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/03/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Emily D Shoda) (AMP) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/03/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Emily D Shoda) (AMP) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/03/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Emily D Shoda) (AMP) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Emily D. Shoda ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3734873.) by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gavin S. Appleby ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3734868.) by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 2-228-18. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3734854), filed by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Knox County Circuit Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Knox County Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Gwen Reichel, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to State Court of FIling of Notice of Removal, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less