This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2019 at 02:43:18 (UTC).

Lapter et al v. Equifax, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 Lapter filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Equifax, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-03445

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Slyne

Daniel DeMarco, Jr.

Alain Lapter

Ana Lapter

Stacey J. P. Ullman

Jennifer Pascucci DeMarco

Pamela Klein

Defendant

Equifax, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Emert

Attorney at Stull Stull & Brody

6 East 45Th Street

New York, NY 10017

Howard Theodore Longman

Attorney at Stull Stull & Brody

6 East 45Th Street

New York, NY 10017

James M. Evangelista

Attorney at Evangelista Worley, LLC

Suite 100, 8100 A Roswell Road

Atlanta, GA 30350

Michael J. Klein

Attorney at Stull Stull & Brody

6 East 45Th Street

New York, NY 10017

David James Worley

Attorney at Evangelista Worley, LLC

Suite 100, 8100 A Roswell Road

Atlanta, GA 30350

Kristi Stahnke McGregor

Attorney at Evangelista Worley, LLC

Suite 100, 8100 A Roswell Road

Atlanta, GA 30350

Melissa Robin Emert

Attorney at Stull Stull & Brody

6 East 45Th Street

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Sidney Stewart Haskins, II

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - ATL

1180 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Elizabeth Dees Adler

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP-ATL 40

40Th Floor, 1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

John Christopher Toro

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - ATL

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Phyllis Buchen Sumner

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - ATL

1180 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

David Lewis Balser

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP-ATL 40

40Th Floor, 1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David Lewis Balser on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Balser, David) (Entered: 09/18/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Dees Adler on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Adler, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Toro on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Toro, John) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney Stewart Haskins, II on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Haskins, Sidney) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Equifax, Inc. of Related Case (Sumner, Phyllis) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Phyllis Buchen Sumner on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Sumner, Phyllis) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax, Inc. (dfb) (Entered: 09/13/2017)

#563

(#24) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING all the individual civil actions linked to this MDL action, EXCLUDING City of Chicago (1:18cv1470) and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (1:18cv5611) vs. Equifax. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.) (EQACtrk) (sap) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#19

Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re #23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(jkl) Modified on 12/11/2017 - pdf did not attach, refiled (jkl). (Entered: 12/11/2017)

#18

(#22) ORDER Scheduling Hearing on Applications for Leadership Appointments for 2/9/2018 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 2108. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

17 #3

Exhibit 2 Financial Cases and Counsel Table

17 #2

Exhibit 1B Small Business Cases and Counsel Table

17 #1

Exhibit 1A Consumer Case amd Counsel Table

17 #87

(#21) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A Consumer Case and Counsel Table, #2 Exhibit 1B Small Business Cases and Counsel Table, #3 Exhibit 2 Financial Cases and Counsel Table)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#47

(#20) (Refiled to link to member cases) Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re #23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al (jkl) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03422-TWT, 1:17-cv-03433-TWT, 1:17-cv-03436-TWT, 1:17-cv-03443-TWT, 1:17-cv-03444-TWT, 1:17-cv-03445-TWT, 1:17-cv-03447-TWT, 1:17-cv-03448-TWT, 1:17-cv-03449-TWT, 1:17-cv-03450-TWT, 1:17-cv-03451-TWT, 1:17-cv-03452-TWT, 1:17-cv-03453-TWT, 1:17-cv-03454-TWT, 1:17-cv-03456-TWT, 1:17-cv-03457-TWT, 1:17-cv-03458-TWT, 1:17-cv-03459-TWT, 1:17-cv-03460-TWT, 1:17-cv-03461-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:17-cv-03476-TWT, 1:17-cv-03477-TWT, 1:17-cv-03479-TWT, 1:17-cv-03480-TWT, 1:17-cv-03482-TWT, 1:17-cv-03483-TWT, 1:17-cv-03484-TWT, 1:17-cv-03487-TWT, 1:17-cv-03492-TWT, 1:17-cv-03497-TWT, 1:17-cv-03498-TWT, 1:17-cv-03499-TWT, 1:17-cv-03501-TWT, 1:17-cv-03502-TWT, 1:17-cv-03507-TWT, 1:17-cv-03509-TWT, 1:17-cv-03512-TWT, 1:17-cv-03523-TWT, 1:17-cv-03571-TWT, 1:17-cv-03578-TWT, 1:17-cv-03582-TWT, 1:17-cv-03586-TWT, 1:17-cv-03587-TWT, 1:17-cv-03613-TWT, 1:17-cv-03618-TWT, 1:17-cv-03659-TWT, 1:17-cv-03676-TWT, 1:17-cv-03708-TWT, 1:17-cv-03713-TWT, 1:17-cv-03715-TWT, 1:17-cv-03745-TWT, 1:17-cv-03764-TWT, 1:17-cv-03765-TWT, 1:17-cv-03769-TWT, 1:17-cv-03798-TWT, 1:17-cv-03809-TWT, 1:17-cv-03829-TWT, 1:17-cv-03863-TWT, 1:17-cv-03872-TWT, 1:17-cv-03873-TWT, 1:17-cv-03881-TWT, 1:17-cv-03885-TWT, 1:17-cv-03886-TWT, 1:17-cv-03892-TWT, 1:17-cv-03905-TWT, 1:17-cv-03972-TWT, 1:17-cv-04159-TWT, 1:17-cv-04184-TWT, 1:17-cv-04250-TWT, 1:17-cv-04388-TWT, 1:17-cv-04389-TWT, 1:17-cv-04480-TWT, 1:17-cv-04544-TWT, 1:17-cv-04600-TWT, 1:17-cv-04694-TWT, 1:17-cv-04707-TWT, 1:17-cv-04756-TWT, 1:17-cv-04763-TWT, 1:17-cv-04775-TWT, 1:17-cv-04792-TWT, 1:17-cv-04822-TWT, 1:17-cv-04940-TWT, 1:17-cv-04942-TWT, 1:17-cv-04986-TWT, 1:17-cv-04987-TWT, 1:17-cv-04988-TWT, 1:17-cv-04989-TWT, 1:17-cv-04990-TWT, 1:17-cv-04996-TWT, 1:17-cv-04997-TWT, 1:17-cv-05001-TWT, 1:17-cv-05002-TWT, 1:17-cv-05003-TWT, 1:17-cv-05004-TWT, 1:17-cv-05005-TWT, 1:17-cv-05006-TWT, 1:17-cv-05007-TWT, 1:17-cv-05008-TWT, 1:17-cv-05009-TWT, 1:17-cv-05010-TWT, 1:17-cv-05014-TWT, 1:17-cv-05015-TWT, 1:17-cv-05016-TWT, 1:17-cv-05017-TWT, 1:17-cv-05020-TWT, 1:17-cv-05021-TWT, 1:17-cv-05022-TWT, 1:17-cv-05023-TWT, 1:17-cv-05024-TWT, 1:17-cv-05025-TWT, 1:17-cv-05026-TWT, 1:17-cv-05027-TWT, 1:17-cv-05028-TWT, 1:17-cv-05029-TWT, 1:17-cv-05037-TWT, 1:17-cv-05038-TWT, 1:17-cv-05039-TWT, 1:17-cv-05040-TWT, 1:17-cv-05041-TWT, 1:17-cv-05042-TWT, 1:17-cv-05048-TWT, 1:17-cv-05049-TWT, 1:17-cv-05050-TWT, 1:17-cv-05058-TWT, 1:17-cv-05059-TWT, 1:17-cv-05060-TWT, 1:17-cv-05061-TWT, 1:17-cv-05062-TWT, 1:17-cv-05063-TWT, 1:17-cv-05067-TWT, 1:17-cv-05068-TWT(jkl) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

#46

(#19) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Initial case management conference set for 1/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/8/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(jkl) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Jennifer Pascucci DeMarco, Ana Lapter, Alain Lapter, Pamela Klein, Michael Slyne, Stacey J. P. Ullman, Daniel DeMarco, Jr. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-7375173.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/13/2017)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.) (EQACtrk) (sap) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING all the individual civil actions linked to this MDL action, EXCLUDING City of Chicago (1:18cv1470) and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (1:18cv5611) vs. Equifax. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.) (EQACtrk) (sap) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • NOTICE The Status Conference scheduled for Friday 7/20/2018 at 11:00 a.m. has been cancelled at request of counsel. A date for the next status conference will be determined and notice entered on docket for a date in late August or September. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(ss) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 3. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/20/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(ddm) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER Scheduling Hearing on Applications for Leadership Appointments for 2/9/2018 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 2108. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A Consumer Case and Counsel Table, #2 Exhibit 1B Small Business Cases and Counsel Table, #3 Exhibit 2 Financial Cases and Counsel Table)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) (Refiled to link to member cases) Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re #23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al (jkl) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03422-TWT, 1:17-cv-03433-TWT, 1:17-cv-03436-TWT, 1:17-cv-03443-TWT, 1:17-cv-03444-TWT, 1:17-cv-03445-TWT, 1:17-cv-03447-TWT, 1:17-cv-03448-TWT, 1:17-cv-03449-TWT, 1:17-cv-03450-TWT, 1:17-cv-03451-TWT, 1:17-cv-03452-TWT, 1:17-cv-03453-TWT, 1:17-cv-03454-TWT, 1:17-cv-03456-TWT, 1:17-cv-03457-TWT, 1:17-cv-03458-TWT, 1:17-cv-03459-TWT, 1:17-cv-03460-TWT, 1:17-cv-03461-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:17-cv-03476-TWT, 1:17-cv-03477-TWT, 1:17-cv-03479-TWT, 1:17-cv-03480-TWT, 1:17-cv-03482-TWT, 1:17-cv-03483-TWT, 1:17-cv-03484-TWT, 1:17-cv-03487-TWT, 1:17-cv-03492-TWT, 1:17-cv-03497-TWT, 1:17-cv-03498-TWT, 1:17-cv-03499-TWT, 1:17-cv-03501-TWT, 1:17-cv-03502-TWT, 1:17-cv-03507-TWT, 1:17-cv-03509-TWT, 1:17-cv-03512-TWT, 1:17-cv-03523-TWT, 1:17-cv-03571-TWT, 1:17-cv-03578-TWT, 1:17-cv-03582-TWT, 1:17-cv-03586-TWT, 1:17-cv-03587-TWT, 1:17-cv-03613-TWT, 1:17-cv-03618-TWT, 1:17-cv-03659-TWT, 1:17-cv-03676-TWT, 1:17-cv-03708-TWT, 1:17-cv-03713-TWT, 1:17-cv-03715-TWT, 1:17-cv-03745-TWT, 1:17-cv-03764-TWT, 1:17-cv-03765-TWT, 1:17-cv-03769-TWT, 1:17-cv-03798-TWT, 1:17-cv-03809-TWT, 1:17-cv-03829-TWT, 1:17-cv-03863-TWT, 1:17-cv-03872-TWT, 1:17-cv-03873-TWT, 1:17-cv-03881-TWT, 1:17-cv-03885-TWT, 1:17-cv-03886-TWT, 1:17-cv-03892-TWT, 1:17-cv-03905-TWT, 1:17-cv-03972-TWT, 1:17-cv-04159-TWT, 1:17-cv-04184-TWT, 1:17-cv-04250-TWT, 1:17-cv-04388-TWT, 1:17-cv-04389-TWT, 1:17-cv-04480-TWT, 1:17-cv-04544-TWT, 1:17-cv-04600-TWT, 1:17-cv-04694-TWT, 1:17-cv-04707-TWT, 1:17-cv-04756-TWT, 1:17-cv-04763-TWT, 1:17-cv-04775-TWT, 1:17-cv-04792-TWT, 1:17-cv-04822-TWT, 1:17-cv-04940-TWT, 1:17-cv-04942-TWT, 1:17-cv-04986-TWT, 1:17-cv-04987-TWT, 1:17-cv-04988-TWT, 1:17-cv-04989-TWT, 1:17-cv-04990-TWT, 1:17-cv-04996-TWT, 1:17-cv-04997-TWT, 1:17-cv-05001-TWT, 1:17-cv-05002-TWT, 1:17-cv-05003-TWT, 1:17-cv-05004-TWT, 1:17-cv-05005-TWT, 1:17-cv-05006-TWT, 1:17-cv-05007-TWT, 1:17-cv-05008-TWT, 1:17-cv-05009-TWT, 1:17-cv-05010-TWT, 1:17-cv-05014-TWT, 1:17-cv-05015-TWT, 1:17-cv-05016-TWT, 1:17-cv-05017-TWT, 1:17-cv-05020-TWT, 1:17-cv-05021-TWT, 1:17-cv-05022-TWT, 1:17-cv-05023-TWT, 1:17-cv-05024-TWT, 1:17-cv-05025-TWT, 1:17-cv-05026-TWT, 1:17-cv-05027-TWT, 1:17-cv-05028-TWT, 1:17-cv-05029-TWT, 1:17-cv-05037-TWT, 1:17-cv-05038-TWT, 1:17-cv-05039-TWT, 1:17-cv-05040-TWT, 1:17-cv-05041-TWT, 1:17-cv-05042-TWT, 1:17-cv-05048-TWT, 1:17-cv-05049-TWT, 1:17-cv-05050-TWT, 1:17-cv-05058-TWT, 1:17-cv-05059-TWT, 1:17-cv-05060-TWT, 1:17-cv-05061-TWT, 1:17-cv-05062-TWT, 1:17-cv-05063-TWT, 1:17-cv-05067-TWT, 1:17-cv-05068-TWT(jkl) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re #23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al (jkl) Modified on 12/11/2017 - pdf did not attach, refiled (jkl) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re #23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(jkl) Modified on 12/11/2017 - pdf did not attach, refiled (jkl). (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Initial case management conference set for 1/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/8/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(jkl) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Jason Klein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7394866). Attorney Michael J. Klein added appearing on behalf of Daniel DeMarco, Jr, Jennifer Pascucci DeMarco, Pamela Klein, Alain Lapter, Ana Lapter, Michael Slyne, Stacey J. P. Ullman (cdg) (Entered: 09/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Jason Klein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7394866)by Daniel DeMarco, Jr, Jennifer Pascucci DeMarco, Pamela Klein, Alain Lapter, Ana Lapter, Michael Slyne, Stacey J. P. Ullman. (Evangelista, James) (Entered: 09/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David Lewis Balser on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Balser, David) (Entered: 09/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Dees Adler on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Adler, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Toro on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Toro, John) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney Stewart Haskins, II on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Haskins, Sidney) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Equifax, Inc. of Related Case (Sumner, Phyllis) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Phyllis Buchen Sumner on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Sumner, Phyllis) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax, Inc. (dfb) (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Jennifer Pascucci DeMarco, Ana Lapter, Alain Lapter, Pamela Klein, Michael Slyne, Stacey J. P. Ullman, Daniel DeMarco, Jr. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-7375173.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less