This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:35:39 (UTC).

Lapointe v. USA et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Lapointe filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven J. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00751

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven J. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jack Lapointe

Defendants

Katherine Wetherbee

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leslie C. Nixon

Attorney at Nixon Vogelman Barry Slawsky & Simoneau PA

77 Central St

Manchester, NH 03101

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth E. Ewing

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

Terry L. Ollila

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 31, 2018 filed by Katherine Wetherbee.(Ewing, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#6

(#6) Partially Assented to MOTION to Stay until Defendant Answers or Otherwise Pleads filed by Katherine Wetherbee. Follow up on Objection on 9/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Ewing, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#5

(#5) Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2018-CV-00368, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit Death Certificate

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jack Lapointe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Nixon, Leslie) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#3

(#3) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 10/01/2018 filed by Katherine Wetherbee. Attorney Elizabeth E. Ewing added to party Katherine Wetherbee(pty:dft).(Ewing, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

2 #1

Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law in Support of MTD

#2

(#2) MOTION to Dismiss filed by USA. Follow up on Objection on 9/10/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law in Support of MTD)(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Notice to counsel & clerk

1 #4

Exhibit (Affidavit) C - Certification of US Attorney

1 #3

Attachment to Exhibit B1 - Deeming Letters

1 #2

Exhibit (Affidavit) B - Declaration of Torres

1 #1

Exhibit A - State court complaint and summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough Superior Court Northern District, case number 216-2018-cv-00368 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by USA. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State court complaint and summons, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) B - Declaration of Torres, #3 Attachment to Exhibit B1 - Deeming Letters, #4 Exhibit (Affidavit) C - Certification of US Attorney, #5 Exhibit Notice to counsel & clerk, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 10/31/2018. (lml) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 31, 2018 filed by Katherine Wetherbee.(Ewing, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Partially Assented to MOTION to Stay until Defendant Answers or Otherwise Pleads filed by Katherine Wetherbee. Follow up on Objection on 9/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Ewing, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2018-CV-00368, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jack Lapointe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Nixon, Leslie) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to 10/1/2018. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 10/1/2018. (jbw) (Entered: 09/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 10/01/2018 filed by Katherine Wetherbee. Attorney Elizabeth E. Ewing added to party Katherine Wetherbee(pty:dft).(Ewing, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Dismiss filed by USA. Follow up on Objection on 9/10/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law in Support of MTD)(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-751-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough Superior Court Northern District, case number 216-2018-cv-00368 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by USA. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State court complaint and summons, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) B - Declaration of Torres, #3 Attachment to Exhibit B1 - Deeming Letters, #4 Exhibit (Affidavit) C - Certification of US Attorney, #5 Exhibit Notice to counsel & clerk, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ollila, Terry) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.